This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/29/2021 at 06:30:53 (UTC).

Itzhak Meir Shtark and Ayala Shtark

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Itzhak Meir Shtark and Ayala Shtark was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen S. Jennemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-03936

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen S. Jennemann

 

Party Details

Debtors

Itzhak Meir Shtark

Sanford, FL 32771

Ayala Shtark

Sanford, FL 32771

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

400 West Washington Street, SU 1100

Trustee

Jason A Burgess

Atlantic Beach, FL 32233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Melissa A Youngman

Attorney at Melissa A Youngman, PA

1705 Edgewater Drive, #541507

Orlando, FL 32854

Us Trustee Attorneys

Audrey M Aleskovsky

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

400 West Washington St, SU 1100

Miriam G Suarez

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

400 West Washington Street, SU 1100

Trustee Attorney

Jason A Burgess

1855 Mayport Road

Atlantic Beach, FL 32233

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #39)). Notice Date 10/27/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#41

(#41) Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Bankruptcy and Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors on Additional Creditor Added to Second Amended Schedule D Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark (related document(s)#10). (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#40

(#40) Second Amended Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule J, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules and Certificate of Service in Compliance with Local Rules 1009-1(e) and 9013-3 Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark. (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#39

(#39) Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Melissa A Youngman (Related Doc #34). Service Instructions: Melissa Youngman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Danielle H.) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#37

(#37) Order Striking Amended Schedule A/B, D, and J, Amended Statement of Financial Affairs . (related document(s)#35). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#38

(#38) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Melissa Youngman (Debtor Atty); Audrey Aleskovsky (US Trustee Atty); Jason Burgess (Sub V Trustee); Benjamin Taylor (WP Underground Atty); Jessica Creegan (WP Underground St Court Atty); Gregg Ahrens (Select Atty); RULING: (ZOOM) Initial Status Conference - cont. to December 15, 2021 at 10:15 am (45 minutes reserved); (AOCNFNG); (SMRF) Motion for Relief from Stay Re: 7925 State Rd 46, Sanford, FL 32771 (Doc #24) - cont. to December 15, 2021 at 10:15 am; (AOCNFNG); Sub V Plan Due: 11/29/21 - Sua Sponte Order Extending Plan Due Date to December 10, 2021 Court to issue order directing mediation to be completed by December 14, 2021:Order by Court; (gww). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#36

(#36) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/21/2021 13:45:12 ]. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#35

(#35) Amended Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule J, Includes addition or deletion of creditors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs, and Declaration Concerning Debtors' Schedules (Fee Paid.) Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark. (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#34

(#34) Application to Retain Melissa Youngman, Esq. of Melissa Youngman, PA as Attorney to Debtor Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#33

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #39)). Notice Date 10/27/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Bankruptcy and Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors on Additional Creditor Added to Second Amended Schedule D Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark (related document(s)#10). (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Second Amended Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule J, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules and Certificate of Service in Compliance with Local Rules 1009-1(e) and 9013-3 Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark. (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Order Approving Application to Employ/Retain Melissa A Youngman (Related Doc #34). Service Instructions: Melissa Youngman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Danielle H.) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Order Striking Amended Schedule A/B, D, and J, Amended Statement of Financial Affairs . (related document(s)#35). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Melissa Youngman (Debtor Atty); Audrey Aleskovsky (US Trustee Atty); Jason Burgess (Sub V Trustee); Benjamin Taylor (WP Underground Atty); Jessica Creegan (WP Underground St Court Atty); Gregg Ahrens (Select Atty); RULING: (ZOOM) Initial Status Conference - cont. to December 15, 2021 at 10:15 am (45 minutes reserved); (AOCNFNG); (SMRF) Motion for Relief from Stay Re: 7925 State Rd 46, Sanford, FL 32771 (Doc #24) - cont. to December 15, 2021 at 10:15 am; (AOCNFNG); Sub V Plan Due: 11/29/21 - Sua Sponte Order Extending Plan Due Date to December 10, 2021 Court to issue order directing mediation to be completed by December 14, 2021:Order by Court; (gww). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/21/2021 13:45:12 ]. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)(6:21-bk-03936-KSJ) [misc,schaja] ( 32.00). Receipt Number 68530464, Amount Paid $ 32.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Amended Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule J, Includes addition or deletion of creditors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Statement of Financial Affairs, and Declaration Concerning Debtors' Schedules (Fee Paid.) Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark. (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Application to Retain Melissa Youngman, Esq. of Melissa Youngman, PA as Attorney to Debtor Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Karen S. Jennemann, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (autojtr-orl, orl) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPrior Bankruptcy Case(s) for joint debtors Itzhak Meir Shtark and Ayala Shtark Case Number #98-35106, Chapter 13 filed in Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court on 09/28/1998 , Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/28/1999; Case Number #13-10658, Chapter 7 filed in Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court on 08/27/2013 , Standard Discharge on 12/06/2013; Case Number #95-33420, Chapter 7 filed in Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court on 10/24/1995 , Standard Discharge on 02/12/1996; Case Number #04-06997, Chapter 7 filed in Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court on 06/17/2004 , Standard Discharge on 11/05/2004.(Admin) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 8/30/2021. Amended to Correct date of Completion. Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark. (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 8/30/2021. Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark. (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 8/31/2021. Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark. (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Joint Debtor Ayala Shtark, Debtor Itzhak Meir Shtark. (Youngman, Melissa) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:21-bk-03936) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number 68154816, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). List of 20 Largest Creditors. Schedules and Summary of Assets Not Filed. Statement of Income. Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed. Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed. Filed by Melissa A Youngman on behalf of Itzhak Meir Shtark, Ayala Shtark. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 11/29/2021. (Youngman, Melissa) Modified on 8/31/2021 (Ahyen). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A Burgess