This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/17/2021 at 18:03:09 (UTC).

In-Shape Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 In-Shape Holdings, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurie Selber Silverstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-BK-13130

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Laurie Selber Silverstein

 

Party Details

Debtor

In-Shape Holdings, LLC

6507 Pacific Avenue, #344

Stockton, CA 95207

Not Classified By Court

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Stretto

410 Exchange, Ste 100

Irvine, CA 92602

OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Evelyn J. Meltzer

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP

Suite 5100, 1313 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19899

David M. Fournier

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

Hercules Plaza, Suite 5100, 1313 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19899-1709

Jane Kim

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Gabrielle Albert

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Danisha Brar

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Marcy J. McLaughlin Smith

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

Hercules Plaza, Suite 5100, 1313 N. Market Street, P.O. Box 1709

Wilmington, DE 19899-1709

Thomas B. Rupp

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Dara Levinson Silveira

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Tobias S. Keller

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Us Trustee Attorney

Jane M. Leamy

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

844 King St., Suite 2207

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Aaron H. Stulman

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

1313 N. Market Street, 6Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kristin S. Elliott

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

James S. Carr

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

3 World Trade Center, 175 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Christopher M. Samis

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

1313 N. Market Street, 6Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Whitney M. Smith

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

One Jefferson Road, 2Nd Floor

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Lauren S. Schlussel

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

 

Court Documents

318 #2

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

318 #1

Main Document

299 #3

Proposed Form of Order

299 #2

Notice

299 #1

Main Document

281 #3

Exhibit B - Counterparty Objections

18 #4

Exhibit C - Asset Purchase Agreement

18 #3

Exhibit B - Bidding Procedures Order

18 #2

Exhibit A- (Highlighted Provisions Pursuant to Del. Bankr. L.R. 6004-1)

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#1

589 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#318) Certificate of No Objection Regarding Notice of Third Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Sublease and (II) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)#299) Filed by In-Shape Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#317) Third Notice of Debtors' Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Certain Designation Rights Contracts (related document(s)#18, #281) Filed by In-Shape Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Assumed and Assigned Lease #2 Exhibit B - Assumption and Assignment Order) (Meltzer, Evelyn) Modified on 3/16/2021 to Correct Text (LB). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#316) Second Notice of Debtors' Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Certain Supplemental Purchased Contracts and/or Designation Rights Contracts (related document(s)#18, #281) Filed by In-Shape Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Assumed and Assigned Contracts #2 Exhibit A-2 - Assumed and Assigned Leases) (Meltzer, Evelyn) Modified on 3/16/2021 to Correct Text (LB). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#315) Affidavit/Declaration of Service (SUPPLEMENTAL) re: Notice of Telephonic Section 341 Meeting (Docket No. 60), Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 69), Notice of Bidding Procedures, Auction Date, and Sale Hearing (Docket No. 183), and Notice of Third Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Sublease and (II) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 299). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#60, #69, #183, #299) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#314) Order Approving The Assumption And Assignment Of Certain Designation Rights Contracts (related document(s)#18, #281, #297) Order Signed on 3/12/2021. (CMB) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#313) Certificate of No Objection Regarding Notice of Debtors' Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Certain Designation Rights Contracts (related document(s)#297) Filed by In-Shape Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#312) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Date (Docket No. 296), Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates (Docket No. 305), and Notice of Revised Exhibit to Third Omnibus Motion for Entry of an order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Sublease and (II) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 306). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#296, #305, #306) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#311) Affidavit/Declaration of Service (SUPPLEMENTAL) re: Notice of Telephonic Section 341 Meeting (Docket No. 60), Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 69), and Notice of Bidding Procedures, Auction Date, and Sale Hearing (Docket No. 183). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#60, #68, #183) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#310) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Debtors Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Certain Designation Rights Contracts (Docket No. 297), Notice of Debtors Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Certain Supplemental Purchased Contracts (Docket No. 298), Notice of Third Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Sublease and (II) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 299), Second Monthly Fee Application of Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP for Allowance and Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of January 1, 2021 Through January 31, 2021 (Docket No. 301), First Monthly Fee Application of Chilmark Partners, LLC for Allowance and Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of December 16, 2021 Through January 31, 2021 (Docket No. 302), Second Monthly Application of Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP as Co- Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period from January 1, 2021 Through and Including January 31, 2021 (Docket No. 303), and Notice of Sale Closing and Purchased Contracts (Docket No. 304). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#297, #298, #299, #301, #302, #303, #304) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#309) Monthly Application for Compensation // Combined First Monthly Application of Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Delaware Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of In-Shape Holdings, LLC, et al., for the period December 29, 2020 to January 31, 2021 Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. Objections due by 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Certificate of Service) (Stulman, Aaron) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
308 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Continue Customer Programs [Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations to Customers and to Otherwise Continue Certain Customer Programs in the Ordinary Course of Business] Filed By In-Shape Holdings, LLC (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims [Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Obligations to Critical Vendors and (II) Granting Related Relief] Filed By In-Shape Holdings, LLC (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service [Motion of the Debtors for Interim and Final Orders Establishing Adequate Assurance Procedures with Respect to the Debtors' Utility Providers] Filed By In-Shape Holdings, LLC (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes [Motion of the Debtors for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes] Filed By In-Shape Holdings, LLC (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions [Motion of the Debtors for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Payment of Prepetition Insurance Obligations] Filed By In-Shape Holdings, LLC (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Pay Employee Wages [Motion of the Debtors for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Employee Wages, Benefits, and Related Items; and (B) Continue Certain Employee Compensation and Benefit Programs in the Ordinary Course] Filed By In-Shape Holdings, LLC (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent STRETTO Filed By In-Shape Holdings, LLC (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by In-Shape Health Clubs, LLC, In-Shape Holdings, LLC, In-Shape Personal Training, LLC. (Meltzer, Evelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-13130) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number 10094262, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by In-Shape Holdings, LLC. (Fournier, David) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stretto is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren S. Schlussel