This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 12/13/2021 at 06:34:13 (UTC).

HUD Facilities, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 HUD Facilities, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen B. Owens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11338

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen B. Owens

 

Party Details

Debtor

HUD Facilities, LLC

40 South Palafox Place, Suite 400

Pensacola, FL 32502

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

844 King Street, SU 2207

Not Classified By Court

Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC

777 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

David R. Hurst

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#5

(#5) Order (I) Authorizing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Gulf Coast Health Care, LLC, Case No. 21-11336 (KBO); GCH Management Services, LLC, Case No. 21-11337 (KBO); HUD Facilities, LLC, Case No. 21-11338 (KBO); Gulf Coast Facilities, LLC, Case No. 21-11339 (KBO); Florida Facilities, LLC, Case No. 21-11340 (KBO); Pensacola Administrative Holdings, LLC, Case No. 21-11341 (KBO); Pensacola Administrative Services, LLC, Case No. 21-11342 (KBO); Gulf Coast Master Tenant Holdings, LLC, Case No. 21-11343 (KBO); Gulf Coast Master Tenant I, LLC, Case No. 21-11344 (KBO); Gulf Coast Master Tenant II, LLC, Case No. 21-11345 (KBO); Gulf Coast Master Tenant III, LLC, Case No. 21-11346 (KBO); AL Citronelle, LLC, Case No. 21-11347 (KBO); AL Willow Tree, LLC, Case No. 21-11348 (KBO); Brevard Oaks Center, LLC, Case No. 21-11349 (KBO); FL HUD Baybreeze, LLC, Case No. 21-11350 (KBO); FL HUD Bayside, LLC, Case No. 21-11352 (KBO); FL HUD Destin, LLC, Case No. 21-11353 (KBO); FL HUD Margate, LLC, Case No. 21-11354 (KBO); FL HUD Pensacola, LLC, Case No. 21-11355 (KBO); FL HUD Rosewood, LLC, Case No. 21-11356 (KBO); FL HUD Silvercrest, LLC, Case No. 21-11357 (KBO); MF Debary, LLC, Case No. 21-11358 (KBO); MF Flagler, LLC, Case No. 21-11359 (KBO); MF Halifax, LLC, Case No. 21-11360 (KBO); MF Heritage, LLC, Case No. 21-11361 (KBO); MF Lake Eustis, LLC, Case No. 21-11362 (KBO); MF Longwood, LLC, Case No. 21-11363 (KBO); MF Oakwood, LLC, Case No. 21-11364 (KBO); MF Winter Park, LLC, Case No. 21-11365 (KBO); MS Greenbough, LLC, Case No. 21-11366 (KBO); MS HUD Boyington, LLC, Case No. 21-11367 (KBO); MS HUD Dixie, LLC, Case No. 21-11368 (KBO); MS HUD Ocean Springs, LLC, Case No. 21-11369 (KBO); MS HUD Pine View, LLC, Case No. 21-11370 (KBO); MS Lakeside, LLC, Case No. 21-11371 (KBO); MS Shelby, LLC, Case No. 21-11372 (KBO); MS Singing, LLC, Case No. 21-11373 (KBO); NF Brynwood, LLC, Case No. 21-11374 (KBO); NF Chipola, LLC, Case No. 21-11375 (KBO); NF Escambia, LLC, Case No. 21-11376 (KBO); NF Glen Cove, LLC, Case No. 21-11377 (KBO); NF Manor, LLC, Case No. 21-11378 (KBO); NF Nine Mile, LLC, Case No. 21-11379 (KBO); NF Panama, LLC, Case No. 21-11380 (KBO); NF Pensacola Manor, LLC, Case No. 21-11381 (KBO); NF River Chase, LLC, Case No. 21-11382 (KBO); NF Suwannee, LLC, Case No. 21-11383 (KBO); NF Windsor, LLC, Case No. 21-11384 (KBO); SC-GA2018 Cobblestone Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC, Case No. 21-11385 (KBO); SF Berkshire, LLC, Case No. 21-11386 (KBO); SF Boynton, LLC, Case No. 21-11387 (KBO); SF Brevard, LLC, Case No. 21-11388 (KBO); SF Carnegie, LLC, Case No. 21-11389 (KBO); SF Fountainhead, LLC, Case No. 21-11390 (KBO); SF Glen Oaks, LLC, Case No. 21-11391 (KBO); SF Kissimmee, LLC, Case No. 21-11392 (KBO); SF Lake Placid ALF, LLC, Case No. 21-11393 (KBO); SF Lake Placid, LLC, Case No. 21-11394 (KBO); SF Oakbrook, LLC, Case No. 21-11395 (KBO); SF Royal Manor, LLC, Case No. 21-11396 (KBO); SF Salerno, LLC, Case No. 21-11397 (KBO); and SF Tampa, LLC, Case No. 21-11398 (KBO). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Gulf Coast Health Care, LLC, Case No. 21-11336 (KBO). (related document(s)#3) Order Signed on 10/15/2021 (Mml) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#6

(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by HUD Facilities, LLC. (Hurst, David) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#7

(#7) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by HUD Facilities, LLC. (Hurst, David) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by HUD Facilities, LLC. (Hurst, David) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by HUD Facilities, LLC. (Hurst, David) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order (I) Authorizing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Gulf Coast Health Care, LLC, Case No. 21-11336 (KBO); GCH Management Services, LLC, Case No. 21-11337 (KBO); HUD Facilities, LLC, Case No. 21-11338 (KBO); Gulf Coast Facilities, LLC, Case No. 21-11339 (KBO); Florida Facilities, LLC, Case No. 21-11340 (KBO); Pensacola Administrative Holdings, LLC, Case No. 21-11341 (KBO); Pensacola Administrative Services, LLC, Case No. 21-11342 (KBO); Gulf Coast Master Tenant Holdings, LLC, Case No. 21-11343 (KBO); Gulf Coast Master Tenant I, LLC, Case No. 21-11344 (KBO); Gulf Coast Master Tenant II, LLC, Case No. 21-11345 (KBO); Gulf Coast Master Tenant III, LLC, Case No. 21-11346 (KBO); AL Citronelle, LLC, Case No. 21-11347 (KBO); AL Willow Tree, LLC, Case No. 21-11348 (KBO); Brevard Oaks Center, LLC, Case No. 21-11349 (KBO); FL HUD Baybreeze, LLC, Case No. 21-11350 (KBO); FL HUD Bayside, LLC, Case No. 21-11352 (KBO); FL HUD Destin, LLC, Case No. 21-11353 (KBO); FL HUD Margate, LLC, Case No. 21-11354 (KBO); FL HUD Pensacola, LLC, Case No. 21-11355 (KBO); FL HUD Rosewood, LLC, Case No. 21-11356 (KBO); FL HUD Silvercrest, LLC, Case No. 21-11357 (KBO); MF Debary, LLC, Case No. 21-11358 (KBO); MF Flagler, LLC, Case No. 21-11359 (KBO); MF Halifax, LLC, Case No. 21-11360 (KBO); MF Heritage, LLC, Case No. 21-11361 (KBO); MF Lake Eustis, LLC, Case No. 21-11362 (KBO); MF Longwood, LLC, Case No. 21-11363 (KBO); MF Oakwood, LLC, Case No. 21-11364 (KBO); MF Winter Park, LLC, Case No. 21-11365 (KBO); MS Greenbough, LLC, Case No. 21-11366 (KBO); MS HUD Boyington, LLC, Case No. 21-11367 (KBO); MS HUD Dixie, LLC, Case No. 21-11368 (KBO); MS HUD Ocean Springs, LLC, Case No. 21-11369 (KBO); MS HUD Pine View, LLC, Case No. 21-11370 (KBO); MS Lakeside, LLC, Case No. 21-11371 (KBO); MS Shelby, LLC, Case No. 21-11372 (KBO); MS Singing, LLC, Case No. 21-11373 (KBO); NF Brynwood, LLC, Case No. 21-11374 (KBO); NF Chipola, LLC, Case No. 21-11375 (KBO); NF Escambia, LLC, Case No. 21-11376 (KBO); NF Glen Cove, LLC, Case No. 21-11377 (KBO); NF Manor, LLC, Case No. 21-11378 (KBO); NF Nine Mile, LLC, Case No. 21-11379 (KBO); NF Panama, LLC, Case No. 21-11380 (KBO); NF Pensacola Manor, LLC, Case No. 21-11381 (KBO); NF River Chase, LLC, Case No. 21-11382 (KBO); NF Suwannee, LLC, Case No. 21-11383 (KBO); NF Windsor, LLC, Case No. 21-11384 (KBO); SC-GA2018 Cobblestone Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC, Case No. 21-11385 (KBO); SF Berkshire, LLC, Case No. 21-11386 (KBO); SF Boynton, LLC, Case No. 21-11387 (KBO); SF Brevard, LLC, Case No. 21-11388 (KBO); SF Carnegie, LLC, Case No. 21-11389 (KBO); SF Fountainhead, LLC, Case No. 21-11390 (KBO); SF Glen Oaks, LLC, Case No. 21-11391 (KBO); SF Kissimmee, LLC, Case No. 21-11392 (KBO); SF Lake Placid ALF, LLC, Case No. 21-11393 (KBO); SF Lake Placid, LLC, Case No. 21-11394 (KBO); SF Oakbrook, LLC, Case No. 21-11395 (KBO); SF Royal Manor, LLC, Case No. 21-11396 (KBO); SF Salerno, LLC, Case No. 21-11397 (KBO); and SF Tampa, LLC, Case No. 21-11398 (KBO). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Gulf Coast Health Care, LLC, Case No. 21-11336 (KBO). (related document(s)#3) Order Signed on 10/15/2021 (Mml) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11338) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number 93556, amount $1738.00. (COH) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by AL Citronelle, LLC, AL Willow Tree, LLC, Brevard Oaks Center, LLC, FL HUD Baybreeze, LLC, FL HUD Bayside, LLC, FL HUD Destin, LLC, FL HUD Margate, LLC, FL HUD Pensacola, LLC, FL HUD Rosewood LLC, FL HUD Silvercrest, LLC, Florida Facilities, LLC, GCH Management Services, LLC, Gulf Coast Facilities, LLC, Gulf Coast Health Care, LLC, Gulf Coast Master Tenant Holdings, LLC, Gulf Coast Master Tenant I, LLC, Gulf Coast Master Tenant II, LLC, Gulf Coast Master Tenant III, LLC, HUD Facilities, LLC, MF Debary, LLC, MF Flagler, LLC, MF Halifax, LLC, MF Heritage, LLC, MF Lake Eustis, LLC, MF Longwood, LLC, MF Oakwood, LLC, MF Winter Park, LLC, MS Greenbough, LLC, MS HUD Boyington, LLC, MS HUD Dixie, LLC, MS HUD Ocean Springs, LLC, MS HUD Pine View, LLC, MS Lakeside, LLC, MS Shelby, LLC, MS Singing, LLC, NF Brynwood, LLC, NF Chipola, LLC, NF Escambia, LLC, NF Glen Cove, LLC, NF Manor, LLC, NF Nine Mile, LLC, NF Panama, LLC, NF Pensacola Manor, LLC, NF River Chase, LLC, NF Suwannee, LLC, NF Windsor, LLC, Pensacola Administrative Holdings, LLC, Pensacola Administrative Services, LLC, SC-GA2018 Cobblestone Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center, LLC, SF Boynton, LLC, SF Brevard, LLC, SF Carnegie, LLC, SF Fountainhead Care Cener, SF Glen Oaks, LLC, SF Kissimmee, LLC, SF Lake Placid ALF, LLC, SF Lake Placid, LLC, SF Oakbrook, LLC, SF Royal Manor, LLC, SF Salerno, LLC, SF Tampa, LLC, SFBerkshire, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hurst, David) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Mary F. Walrath Terminated (LB) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketJudge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by HUD Facilities, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 11/15/2021 (Hurst, David) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUD FACILITIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Hurst