This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 01/18/2022 at 06:31:34 (UTC).

House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Illinois Southern Bankruptcy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-BK-30803

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

 

Party Details

Debtors

House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal

House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.

5501 North Park Drive

East Saint Louis, IL 62204

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

Becker Bldg, Room 1100, 401 Main St

Peoria, IL 61602

Trustee

Thomas Riske

St Louis, MO 63105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Steven M Wallace

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C.

2227 South State Route 157, 62025

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Us Trustee Attorney

Mark D Skaggs

Attorney at US Trustees Office

401 Main St, Suite 1100

Peoria, IL 61602

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Minutes of Court (related document(s)#8 Regarding SubChapter V Status Hearing Held). (tf) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#25

(#25) Status Report for Subchapter V Small Business Debtor Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#24

(#24) Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#23

(#23) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#22

(#22) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#21

(#21) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#20

(#20) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#19

(#19) Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#18

(#18) Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

9 #1

Ch 11 First Mtg Busins SubCh V

8 #2

Status Hrg SubCh V: Notice Recipients

8 #1

Status Hrg SubCh V

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#4 Order and Deficiency Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/24/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#6

(#6) Declaration re: Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Trustee Thomas H. Riske (related document(s) 5 Notice Apppointing Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee). (Riske, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

4 #2

Deficiency Notice: Notice Recipients

4 #1

Deficiency Notice

#3

Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc., #3 Amended Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.) Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due: 2/17/2022. (hm) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#1

Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc., #3 Amended Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.) Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due: 2/17/2022. (hm) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Minutes of Court (related document(s)#8 Regarding SubChapter V Status Hearing Held). (tf) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (related document(s)#9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). (Skaggs, Mark) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Status Report for Subchapter V Small Business Debtor Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Schedule H: Non-Individual- Codebtors Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Schedule G: Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at 341 MTG RM 650 MO AVE (TELEPHONIC). Proof of Claims due by 1/28/2022. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/14/2022. (rj) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order for Subchapter V Status Hearing. Status Hearing before Judge Laura K. Grandy scheduled for 1/13/2022 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Court ESTL. Pre-Status Report Due: 12/30/2021. (kw) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#4 Order and Deficiency Notice) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/24/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration re: Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Trustee Thomas H. Riske (related document(s) 5 Notice Apppointing Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee). (Riske, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#5) The United States Trustee appoints Thomas H. Riske as the Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Skaggs, Mark) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order and Deficiency Notice. Incomplete Filings due by 12/3/2021. (rj) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc., #3 Amended Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.) Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due: 2/17/2022. (hm) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended Voluntary Petition . Filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc. (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.). (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-30803) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A8486885, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by House of Prayer to All Nations of the Pentecostal Faith, Inc.. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/18/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 12/3/2021. Schedule A/B due by 12/3/2021. Schedule D due by 12/3/2021. Schedule E/F due by 12/3/2021. Schedule G due by 12/3/2021. Schedule H due by 12/3/2021. Statement of Affairs due by 12/3/2021. Disclosure of Attorney Compensation due by 12/3/2021. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 12/3/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 12/3/2021. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Due: 09/15/2022. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Skaggs(Designation Retained)