This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 06:32:09 (UTC).

Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Lori V. Vaughan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-BK-05457

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Lori V. Vaughan

 

Party Details

Debtor

Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc.

278 Semoran Commerce Place

Apopka, FL 32703

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Trustee

Aaron R. Cohen

Jacksonville, FL 32201-4218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Aldo G Bartolone, Jr

Attorney at Bartolone Law, PLLC

1030 North Orange Avenue, Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32801

Us Trustee Attorneys

Miriam G Suarez

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Bryan E Buenaventura

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Office - Region 21

400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#68

#67

#66

#65

#64

#63

#62

#60

#52

#18

#16

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Amended Financial Reports for the Period September 1, 2020 to September 30, 2020. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc. (related document(s)#52). (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Proof of Service of Final Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc. (related document(s)#64). (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Proof of Service of Second Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Nunc Pro Tunc to September 29, 2020. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc. (related document(s)#63). (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Agreed Motion for Adequate Protection Re: 2018 Ford F150 (Contains Negative Notice) Filed by Roger A Kelly on behalf of Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Kelly, Roger) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Final Order Granting Motion For Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Related Doc #16). Service Instructions: Aldo Bartolone is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Coleman-Giddens, Faye) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Second Interim Order Granting Motion to Use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 USC 363 Nunc Pro Tunc to September 29, 2020 (related document(s)#18). Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2021 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Aldo Bartolone is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Coleman-Giddens, Faye) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Aldo Bartolone: Debtor; Bryan Buenaventura: UST; Grey Squires-Binford: South State Bank; David Reiner: York International RULING: Zoom Hearing 1) Initial Status Conference - Cont to 1/6/21 at 2:00pm (AOCNFNG) 2) Motion by Debtor for Authority to Pay Affiliate Officer Salaries (Doc #16) - granted on a final basis, order by Bartolone. 3) Motion by Debtor to Use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 USC 363 Nunc Pro Tunc to September 29, 2020 (Doc #18) - granted on interim basis thru 1/6/21, a continued hearing is set for 1/6/21 at 2:00pm. Order by Bartolone. Confirmation will be scheduled at next hearing. (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #60)). Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketThe United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on November 5, 2020. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Buenaventura, Bryan) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Deficient Filing. summary of assets, schedules A-B,D-H, declaration concerning schedules, statement of financial affairs, disclosure of compensation, case management summary not filed . (Kerry) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Lori V. Vaughan, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (autojtr-orl, orl) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: Arnaldo & Yanet Herrero, Behemoth Holding Intl, Dean Blankenship, Jane Blankenship. Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc.. (Kerry) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Debtor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1116(1)(B) Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Balance Sheet Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Tax Documents for the Year 2019 Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Debtor Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc.. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:20-bk-05457) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 65504180, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of Hosanna Building Contractors, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 12/28/2020. (Bartolone, Aldo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan E Buenaventura

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miriam G Suarez