This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2021 at 11:34:16 (UTC).

Horace Edward Griffith and Linda Mary Griffith

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Horace Edward Griffith and Linda Mary Griffith was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott H. Yun. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-20435

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

Scott H. Yun

 

Party Details

Debtors

Horace Edward Griffith

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Linda Mary Griffith

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Trustee

Larry D Simons (TR)

Riverside, CA 92506

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Norma Duenas

2112 E. Fourth St., Ste. 103

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#12

#14

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#12 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/11/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#13) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISCHARGE. Order of Discharge in the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Auto Closed) (Gomez, Andrea) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF BOTH DISCHARGE (BNC) (Gomez, Andrea) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#11) Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Larry D Simons (TR), having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 0, Assets Exempt: $ 194914.71, Claims Scheduled: $ 68996.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 68996.00. Debtor appeared.. (Simons (TR), Larry) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#10) Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (Trustee's 341 Filings) 341(a) Meeting Continued to be held on 1/28/2020 at 10:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Appearance for debtor 2 Debtor appeared. (Simons (TR), Larry) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Ith, Sheryl. (Ith, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor 2 (Joint Debtor) (Official Form 423) (Tonne, Doug) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) (Tonne, Doug) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#5 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 11/29/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:19-bk-20435) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 50181474. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/30/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 02/28/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 02/28/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Duenas, Norma) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Horace Edward Griffith, Joint Debtor Linda Mary Griffith. (Duenas, Norma) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket(#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Horace Edward Griffith, Joint Debtor Linda Mary Griffith. (Duenas, Norma) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Horace Edward Griffith, Joint Debtor Linda Mary Griffith. (Duenas, Norma) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Horace Edward Griffith, Linda Mary Griffith (Duenas, Norma) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norma Duenas