This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/10/2021 at 19:51:29 (UTC).

Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust v. Accounting Principals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Hooper Holmes Inc Liquidation Trust filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Accounting Principals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Drain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-AP-06494

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Robert D. Drain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust

Defendant

Accounting Principals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tracy L. Klestadt

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Main Document

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Clerk's Entry of Default: Notice Recipients

7 #1

Clerk's Entry of Default

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

#5

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAdversary Case 7:20-ap-6494 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Judgment signed on 12/22/2020 Judgment shall be entered against Accounting Principals, Inc. and in favor of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER WPBC 20,0007 (Related Doc #10). (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#12) Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Certificate of No Objection to Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (related document(s)#10, #9) Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#10, #9) Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (related document(s)#9) filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Presentment of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default (related document(s) (Related Doc #7)) . Notice Date 11/27/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's Entry of Default against Accounting Principals Inc. (related document(s)#6). (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B)(Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#1, #2) Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference with hearing to be held on 12/14/2020 (check with court for location) (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#1, #2) Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. Answer due by 9/11/2020. (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 20-06494-rdd) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14212782. Fee amount 350.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 20-06494. Complaint against Accounting Principals, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Hooper Holmes Inc. Liquidation Trust, Accounting Principals, Inc.. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less