This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/18/2022 at 16:10:09 (UTC).

HONX, Inc. and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of HONX,

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 HONX, Inc and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of HONX, was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin Isgur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-BK-90035

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Marvin Isgur

 

Party Details

Debtor

HONX, Inc.

1501 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of HONX, Inc.

Us Trustee

US Trustee, 11

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Matthew D Cavenaugh

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney Street, Ste 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Veronica Ann Polnick

Attorney at Jackson Walker, LLP

1401 Mckinney St., Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Jennifer F Wertz

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

100 Congress Ave, Suite 1100

Austin, TX 78701

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Marty L Brimmage

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2300 N. Field Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Us Trustee Attorneys

Alicia Lenae Barcomb

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

515 Rusk Street, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Stephen Douglas Statham

Attorney at Office of US Trustee

515 Rusk, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#387

(#387) Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Mark D. Plevin (Related Doc #377) Signed on 10/18/2022. (TylerLaws) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#386

(#386) Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Rachel A. Jankowski (Related Doc #376) Signed on 10/18/2022. (TylerLaws) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#385

(#385) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by Marty L. Brimmage, Jr.. This is to order a transcript of the October 17, 2022 Hearing before Judge Marvin P. Isgur. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Access Transcripts (Filed By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of HONX, Inc. ). (Brimmage, Marty) Copy request electronically forwarded to Access Transcripts on 10/17/2022. Estimated completion date 10/18/20220 Modified on 10/17/2022 (ShannonHolden). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#384

(#384) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/17/2022 2:19:04 PM ]. File Size [ 3761 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:50 ]. (admin). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#383

(#383) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/17/2022 1:57:43 PM ]. File Size [ 8224 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:17:08 ]. (admin). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#382

(#382) Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:00 pm - 2:14 pm, 2:20 pm - 2:26 pm. Appearances: See attached. Additional appearances: Annie Catmull, Ed Harron and Robert Brady for Ret. Judge Barbara J. Houser, FCR. Ret. Judge Barbara J. Houser present. Chris Greco with the Debtors. Warren Burns from Burns Charest LLC. Matthew Cavenaugh, Elizabeth Freeman and Veronica Polnick local counsel for the Debtors. Relating to #324, additional briefing by the movant due 12/31/22. Further briefing by the Debtor due 11/7/22. No hearing to be held on #324, the Court will rule on the papers. (Related document(s):#324 Motion to Dismiss Case, #337 Emergency Motion (with hearing date)) (TylerLaws) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#377

(#387) Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Mark D. Plevin (Related Doc #377) Signed on 10/18/2022. (TylerLaws) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#376

(#386) Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Rachel A. Jankowski (Related Doc #376) Signed on 10/18/2022. (TylerLaws) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

337 #1

Main Document

6 #3

Adversary Cover Sheet

6 #2

Proposed Order TRO

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Order Granting Complex Case Treatment, Signed on 4/28/2022 (Related document(s):#2 Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case) (LinhthuDo) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Proposed Order RE: Order Granting Complex Case Treatment (Filed By HONX, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#2 Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case) (Polnick, Veronica) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Granting Leave to File a Revised Form of Order, Signed on 4/28/2022 (Related document(s):#2 Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case) (TylerLaws) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by HONX, Inc.. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

486 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#387) Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Mark D. Plevin (Related Doc #377) Signed on 10/18/2022. (TylerLaws) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#386) Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Rachel A. Jankowski (Related Doc #376) Signed on 10/18/2022. (TylerLaws) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#385) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by Marty L. Brimmage, Jr.. This is to order a transcript of the October 17, 2022 Hearing before Judge Marvin P. Isgur. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Access Transcripts (Filed By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of HONX, Inc. ). (Brimmage, Marty) Copy request electronically forwarded to Access Transcripts on 10/17/2022. Estimated completion date 10/18/20220 Modified on 10/17/2022 (ShannonHolden). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#384) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/17/2022 2:19:04 PM ]. File Size [ 3761 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:50 ]. (admin). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#383) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/17/2022 1:57:43 PM ]. File Size [ 8224 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:17:08 ]. (admin). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#382) Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:00 pm - 2:14 pm, 2:20 pm - 2:26 pm. Appearances: See attached. Additional appearances: Annie Catmull, Ed Harron and Robert Brady for Ret. Judge Barbara J. Houser, FCR. Ret. Judge Barbara J. Houser present. Chris Greco with the Debtors. Warren Burns from Burns Charest LLC. Matthew Cavenaugh, Elizabeth Freeman and Veronica Polnick local counsel for the Debtors. Relating to #324, additional briefing by the movant due 12/31/22. Further briefing by the Debtor due 11/7/22. No hearing to be held on #324, the Court will rule on the papers. (Related document(s):#324 Motion to Dismiss Case, #337 Emergency Motion (with hearing date)) (TylerLaws) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#381) AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by Veronica Polnick. This is to order a transcript of 10/17/2022 before Judge Marvin P. Isgur. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Access Transcripts (Filed By HONX, Inc. ). (Polnick, Veronica) Electronically forwarded to Access Transcripts on 10/17/2022. Estimated completion date is 10/18/2022. Modified on 10/17/2022 (ShannonHolden). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#380) Certificate of Service re: Fourth Monthly Fee Statement of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from August 1, 2022 Through August 31, 2022 (Docket No. 371), Third Monthly Fee Statement of Province, LLC for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from August 1, 2022 Through August 31, 2022 (Docket No. 372) (Filed By Stretto ).(Related document(s):#371 Statement, #372 Statement) (Stretto) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#379) Certificate of Service re: First Interim Fee Application of Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP, Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, for the Fee Period from April 28, 2022 Through and Including July 31, 2022 (Docket No. 370) (Filed By Stretto ).(Related document(s):#370 Application for Compensation) (Stretto) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#378) Certificate of Service re: Reply in Support of Emergency Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of HONC, Inc. to Continue Hearing on (I) Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Estimation of Debtors Aggregate Liability for Current and Future Asbestos Claims and Establishing a Schedule for Estimation Proceeding and (II) Any Motion Seeking to Establish a Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim as It Pertains to Asbestos Claimants (Docket No. 373), Notice of Amended Agenda for Emergency Hearing Scheduled for October 17, 2022 at 2:00 P.M. (Prevailing Central Time) (Docket No. 374) (Filed By Stretto ).(Related document(s):#373 Reply, #374 Notice) (Stretto) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
382 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Declaration re: Declaration of Todd R. Snyder, Chief Administrative Officer of HONX, Inc., In Support of Chapter 11 Petition and First Day Motions (Filed By HONX, Inc. ). (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Charles A Beckham Jr Filed by on behalf of Hess Corporation (Beckham, Charles) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Adversary case 22-03129. Nature of Suit: (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Complaint for Injunctive Relief by HONX, Inc. against Those Parties Listed in Appendix A to Complaint and John and Jane Does 1-1000. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order TRO #2 Adversary Cover Sheet) (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Granting Complex Case Treatment, Signed on 4/28/2022 (Related document(s):#2 Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case) (LinhthuDo) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Order RE: Order Granting Complex Case Treatment (Filed By HONX, Inc. ).(Related document(s):#2 Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case) (Polnick, Veronica) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Granting Leave to File a Revised Form of Order, Signed on 4/28/2022 (Related document(s):#2 Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case) (TylerLaws) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Filed By HONX, Inc. ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Polnick, Veronica) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Alicia Lenae Barcomb (Barcomb, Alicia) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen Douglas Statham (Statham, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by HONX, Inc.. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia Lenae Barcomb