This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/18/2021 at 07:53:52 (UTC).

Hollister v. BOBS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Hollister filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against BOBS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Neil W. Bason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-AP-01173

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Neil W. Bason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Hollister

Los Angeles, CA 90039

Defendant

BOBS LLC

600 S. Spring St., Unit Office

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A Tilem

Attorney at Law Offices of David A Tilem

206 N Jackson St Ste 201

Glendale, CA 91206

Defendant Attorney

M. Jonathan Hayes

Attorney at Resnik Hayes Moradi LLP

17609 Ventura Blvd.Suite 314

Encino, CA 91316

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/10/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Staying Prosecution of Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/8/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dana Hollister). (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of lodgment Proposed Order Staying Prosecution of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Dana Hollister (RE: related document(s)#1 Adversary case 2:21-ap-01173. Complaint by Dana Hollister against BOBS LLC. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) filed by Plaintiff Dana Hollister). (Tilem, David) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Opposition to (related document(s): #2 Summons Issued) Answer to Hollister's Complaint Filed by Defendant BOBS LLC (Hayes, M.) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Service Executed on Dana Hollister 8/23/2021 (Tilem, David) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on BOBS LLC Date Issued 8/19/2021, Answer Due 9/20/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dana Hollister) Status hearing to be held on 10/26/2021 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:21-ap-01173. Complaint by Dana Hollister against BOBS LLC. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Tilem, David) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOBS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M. Jonathan Hayes