This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/10/2020 at 05:56:21 (UTC).

Hoffman v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 Hoffman filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Northern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Novack. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-AP-01014

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Charles Novack

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hoffman

Timothy W. Hoffman, Trustee in Bankruptcy of the Estate of PNI Sensor Corporation

P.O. Box 1761

Sebastopol, CA 95473

Defendants

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Sutter Health Plan

7801 Folsom Blvd. #202

Sacramento, CA 95826

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.

One Kaiser Plaza

Oakland, CA 94612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John H. MacConaghy

Attorney at MacConaghy and Barnier

645 1St St. W #D

Sonoma, CA 95476

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Jon Olson

Attorney at Macdonald Fernandez LLP

221 Sansome St. 3Rd Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #4

Ntc to Plaintiff: Notice Recipients

#3

Ntc to Plaintiff

3 #2

Discovery Order: Notice Recipients

#2

Summons: Notice Recipients

2 #1

Summons

1 #4

AP Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

#1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketAdversary Case Closed 1:19-ap-1014. (rs) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (entire action) Case Management Action due after 08/29/2019. Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman. (MacConaghy, John) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/3/2019 11:10:03 AM ]. File Size [ 88 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:22 ]. ( ). (admin). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Held 7/3/19 at 11:00 AM (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by Timothy W. Hoffman) Minutes: Off calendar. The matter has settled and the court drops the hearing. Appearance: Jean Barnier. (ds) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Status Conference Statement (RE: related document(s)#2 Summons Issued). Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman (MacConaghy, John). DEFECTIVE ENTRY: PDF reflects incorrect case number on page #1. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk added linkage to document #2. Modified on 6/28/2019 (klr). (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/22/2019 11:05:34 AM ]. File Size [ 68 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:17 ]. ( ). (admin). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Continued (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by Timothy W. Hoffman) Hearing scheduled for 07/03/2019 at 11:00 AM at Santa Rosa Courtroom. (After hearing, matter has been settled and plaintiff will file settlement documents.) (Appearance: Jean Barnier) (ds) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Status Conference Statement (RE: related document(s)#2 Summons Issued). Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman (MacConaghy, John) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulation, for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman). (MacConaghy, John). DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event code selected. Modified on 4/18/2019 (klr). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulation, Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint Filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. (RE: related document(s)#2 Summons Issued). (Olson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Service Executed on Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. 3/19/2019; Sutter Health Plan 3/19/2019 . (MacConaghy, John) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). Filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman (MacConaghy, John) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (yw) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. Answer Due 4/17/2019; Sutter Health Plan Answer Due 4/17/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Timothy W. Hoffman). Scheduling Conference scheduled for 5/22/2019 at 11:00 AM at Santa Rosa Courtroom. (yw) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Complaint(19-01014) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 29425877, amount $ 350.00 (re: Doc#1 Complaint) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case #19-01014. 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference), 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer), 14 (Recovery of money/property - other) Complaint by Timothy W. Hoffman against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Sutter Health Plan. Fee Amount $350. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 AP Cover Sheet) (MacConaghy, John) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUTTER HEALTH PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases where Hoffman is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J. Olson Esquire