Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2020 at 06:31:21 (UTC).

Hi-Crush Blair LLC Jointly Administered under 20-33495.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2020 Hi-Crush Blair LLC Jointly Administered under 20-33495 was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-33502

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtors

Hi-Crush Blair LLC Jointly Administered under 20-33495.

Hi-Crush Blair LLC

1330 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77056

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Timothy Alvin Davidson, II

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

600 Travis, Ste 4200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Order for Joint Administration under 20-33495. Signed on 7/12/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Hi-Crush Blair LLC. (Davidson, Timothy) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) No Creditor Mailing List (JosephWellsadi) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-33495 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order for Joint Administration under 20-33495. Signed on 7/12/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-33502) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22267832. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Hi-Crush Blair LLC. (Davidson, Timothy) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Alvin Davidson, II