This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 05:20:33

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Henry L Hall and Dawn A Hall in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 6:19-BK-19045
  • Filing Date 10/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 7
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Mark D. Houle
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • Debtor Dawn A Hall
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Trustee Lynda T. Bui (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • US Trustee United States Trustee (RS)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Henry L Hall
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received ...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor ...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on ...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amou...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 14. Receipt Number 60147795. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Henry L Hall, Joint Debtor Dawn A Hall) (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Dawn A Hall , Debtor Henry L Hall . (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Dawn A Hall (RE: related document(s) Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)). (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Henry L Hall, Joint Debtor Dawn A Hall) Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Henry L Hall , Dawn A Hall (Romero, Kimberly) COMMENT: See docket entry #5 for correction. Case deficient for Cert. of Credit Counseling (Debtor Only) due by 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. Modified on 10/15/2019 (Romero, Kimberly). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.