This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 05:24:29

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Henry Benjamin Phillips, Jr in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 8:19-BK-14004
  • Filing Date 10/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 13
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Catherine E. Bauer
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • US Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Henry Benjamin Phillips, Jr.
  • Represented By
    • Heather J Canning
  • Trustee Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
#9

(#9) Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Case for Orde...

Fees Apply
7 #2

CORRECT PDF Ch 13 First Mtg

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Property value is listed...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 1...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Henry ...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • (#9) Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Case for Order Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay as the Court Deems Appropriate 9641 Paseo De Oro, Cypress, CA 90630; 2013 Chevy Malibu; 2004 Chevy Tahoe . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Debtor Henry Benjamin Phillips Jr. (Canning, Heather) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#8) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Judge was reassigned due to prior cases. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Henry Benjamin Phillips) (Bustillos, Denise) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • Judge Catherine E. Bauer added to case per prior filings. Involvement of Judge Erithe A. Smith Terminated. (Bustillos, Denise) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #4 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #4 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion to Avoid Lien (CM07). (RE: related document(s) #4 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion to Assume Contract/Leases (CM06). (RE: related document(s) #4 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Henry Benjamin Phillips Jr.. (Canning, Heather) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Henry Benjamin Phillips Jr.. (Canning, Heather) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#4) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Property value is listed at an amount LESS THAN the Secured Amount Claimed: 2 included. Lien avoidance: 1 included. Assumption of executory contracts and/or unexpired leases: 1 included. Filed by Debtor Henry Benjamin Phillips Jr.. (Canning, Heather) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Henry Benjamin Phillips Jr.. (Canning, Heather) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Henry Benjamin Phillips Jr.. (Canning, Heather) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/12/2019 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Canning, Heather). The case judge is Catherine E Bauer. Modified on 10/15/2019 (Nguyen, Vi). (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(8:19-bk-14004) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49920917. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Henry Benjamin Phillips Jr. (Canning, Heather) WARNING: See docket entry no. 8 for corrections. Modified on 10/15/2019 (Bustillos, Denise). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.