This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/13/2022 at 06:33:34 (UTC).

Hawaiian Riverbend, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Hawaiian Riverbend, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Northern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen L. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-BK-50314

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Stephen L. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Hawaiian Riverbend, LLC

Po Box 3181

Saratoga, CA 95070

Us Trustee

Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ

U.S. Federal Bldg., 280 S 1St St. #268

San Jose, CA 95113-3004

Trustee

Gina R. Klump

Petaluma, CA 94952

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael Jay Berger

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Jay Berger

9454 Wilshire Blvd., 6Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Us Trustee Attorneys

Elvina Rofael

Attorney at DOJ-Ust

450 Golden Gate Avenue, Ste 05-0153

San Francisco, CA 94102

Marta Villacorta

Attorney at Office of the U. S. Trustee

280 South 1St Street, Suite 268

San Jose, CA 95113

 

Court Documents

#63

(#63) BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) #59 Order on Motion to Shorten Time). Notice Date 06/11/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/11/2022)

#62

(#62) BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) #57 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney). Notice Date 06/10/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

61 #2

Certificate of Service

59 #2

Electronic Order Chatty: Notice Recipients

59 #1

Main Document

57 #2

Electronic Order Chatty: Notice Recipients

57 #1

Main Document

51 #4

Certificate of Service

51 #1

Main Document

7 #1

Pmt of State & Fed Taxes

6 #2

ORDER SETTING STATUS CONF. SUB: Notice Recipients

6 #1

ORDER SETTING STATUS CONF. SUB

5 #2

Order for Non-Individual: Notice Recipients

5 #1

Order for Non-Individual

4 #2

Notice of Ch11 Mtg C/P SubCh V: Notice Recipients

4 #1

Notice of Ch11 Mtg C/P SubCh V

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Debtor Hawaiian Riverbend, LLC (Berger, Michael)DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event code selected. Modified on 4/15/2022 (bg). (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#1

Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-50314) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A31883364, amount $1738.00 (re: Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) #59 Order on Motion to Shorten Time). Notice Date 06/11/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) #57 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney). Notice Date 06/10/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Notice of Hearing ON MOTION TO CONVERT CASE TO CHAPTER 7, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR DISMISSAL WITH REFILING BAR (RE: related document(s)#51 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 or in the Alternative, Dismissal with Refiling Bar Fee Amount $15 Filed by Creditors Kenneth Y. Kai, Tae K. Kai (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew C. Shannon # 2 Request for Judicial Notice # 3 Certificate of Service) (Silver, Wayne) DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Additional Event Code not selected. Modified on 6/8/2022 (jmb).). Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2022 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Creditors Kenneth Y. Kai, Tae K. Kai (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Silver, Wayne) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Request for Notice Filed by Interested Party Michael Jay Berger (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Set On Order Shortening Time (RE: related document(s)#51 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 or in the Alternative, Dismissal with Refiling Bar Fee Amount $15). Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2022 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (al) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Order Shortening Time for Notice of Hearing on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7, or in the Alternative, for Dismissal with Refiling Bar (Related Doc #58) (al) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Motion to Shorten Time (RE: related document(s)#51 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 filed by Creditor Kenneth Y. Kai, Creditor Tae K. Kai). Filed by Creditors Kenneth Y. Kai, Tae K. Kai (Attachments: #1 Declaration #2 Certificate of Service) (Silver, Wayne) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Order Granting Debtor's Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Related Doc #28) (al) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Continued (RE: related document(s) #46 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal). Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 02:00 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Court shorten time to allow Wayne Silver to notice the hearing on the motion to convert or dismiss set for June 21, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Opposition by June 16, 2022. Mr. Silver to file an Application to Shorten Time. (al) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Held (RE: related document(s) #24 Application to Employ Michael Jay Berger as General Bankruptcy Counsel ). Michael Berger appearing on behalf of the Debtor, Elvina Rofael appearing on behalf of the U.S. Trustee and Wayne Silver appearing on behalf of Creditors Kenneth Kai and Tae Kai. Matter is taken under submission. (al) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) #5 Order to File Missing Documents). Notice Date 04/17/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s) #4 Generate 341 Notices). Notice Date 04/17/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes (admin) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order and Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference Status Conference scheduled for 6/2/2022 at 11:00 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Pre-Status Conference Report due by 5/19/2022 (bg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order to File Required Documents and Notice of Automatic Dismissal. (bg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) (bg) NOTE: Amended Notice to be generated to change the time from 1:00 pm to 10:00 am. See docket #21. Modified on 4/26/2022 (jf). (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Docket(#3) First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/17/2022 at 01:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Proofs of Claims due by 6/23/2022. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Debtor Hawaiian Riverbend, LLC (Berger, Michael)DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event code selected. Modified on 4/15/2022 (bg). (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-50314) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A31883364, amount $1738.00 (re: Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Hawaiian Riverbend, LLC. Application to Employ Counsel by Debtor due by 05/16/2022. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 04/21/2022.Incomplete Filings due by 04/28/2022. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Due by 07/13/2022. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elvina Rofael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marta Elena Villacorta