This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/13/2020 at 06:57:53 (UTC).

H2 Beverages, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 H2 Beverages, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy . The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-41948

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

H2 Beverages, Inc.

912 Presidio Court

Allen, TX 75013

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Eric A. Liepins

12770 Coit Road, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee Attorneys

Timothy W. O'Neal

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#6

#3

Service List

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Main Document

2 #3

Service List

2 #1

Main Document

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#15 Order on Request For Post-Petition Utility Deposit (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Determine Adequacy of Utiltiy Service Deposit Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor H2 Beverages, Inc.). (pr)). Notice Date 10/17/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 10/16/20 Filed by US Trustee (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#14 Order Granting Application for Authority to Employ Counsel for Debtro (RE: related document(s)#2 Application to Employ Eric Liepins PC Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc.). (lc)). Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order on Request For Post-Petition Utility Deposit (RE: related document(s)#3 Motion to Determine Adequacy of Utiltiy Service Deposit Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor H2 Beverages, Inc.). (pr) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Order Granting Application for Authority to Employ Counsel for Debtro (RE: related document(s)#2 Application to Employ Eric Liepins PC Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc.). (lc) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Electronic Filing In Re (Original): (RE: related document(s)#13 Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#11 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G,. Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. Document Due 09/28/2020. filed by Debtor H2 Beverages, Inc.). filed by Debtor H2 Beverages, Inc.). (slt) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Original***Declaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#13 Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#11 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G,. Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. Document Due 09/28/2020. filed by Debtor H2 Beverages, Inc.). filed by Debtor H2 Beverages, Inc.). (pr) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#11 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G,. Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. Document Due 09/28/2020. filed by Debtor H2 Beverages, Inc.). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 6717.00 Amount Paid $ 6717.00 Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G,. Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. Document Due 09/28/2020. (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#5 Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/16/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd)). Notice Date 09/17/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#6 Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 03/15/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 07/12/2021. Filed by US Trustee (O'Neal, Timothy) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). Notice Date 09/17/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/16/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 1/12/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/15/2021. (pr)). Notice Date 09/17/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/16/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/16/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 1/12/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/15/2021. (pr) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 03/15/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 07/12/2021. Filed by US Trustee (O'Neal, Timothy) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to Determine Adequacy of Utiltiy Service Deposit Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Employ Eric Liepins PC Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-41948) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11757054, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by H2 Beverages, Inc., Document Due 09/21/2020.(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy W. O'Neal