This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/04/2021 at 06:35:22 (UTC).

GreenKarma, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 GreenKarma, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New Jersey Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Stacey L. Meisel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-11823

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Stacey L. Meisel

 

Party Details

Debtor

GreenKarma, LLC

425 Washington Blvd., Suite 2101

Jersey City, NJ 07310

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

One Newark Center Ste 2100

Newark, NJ 07102

Trustee

Mark Politan

Mendham, NJ 07945

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

David L. Stevens

Attorney at Scura, Wigfield, Heyer & Stevens

1599 Hamburg Turnpike

Wayne, NJ 07470

Scura, Wigfield, Heyer & Stevens

1599 Hamburg Turnpike

Wayne, NJ 07470

Us Trustee Attorney

Fran B. Steele

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

One Newark Center, Suite 2100

Newark, NJ 07102-5504

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/21/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#19

(#19) Order Granting Application to Employ Scura, Wigfield, Heyer & Stevens as Counsel for Debtor (Related Doc #15). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/19/2021. (ntp) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#18

(#18) Status Report for Subchapter V(related document:#6 Notice of Hearing -(No Upload)) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#17

(#17) Certificate of Service (related document:#15 Application for Retention filed by Debtor GreenKarma, LLC) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#16

(#16) Document re: Notice Regarding Telephonic 341 Meeting of Creditors (related document:#5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

15 #3

Proposed Order

15 #2

Certification of Professional

15 #1

Main Document

#14

(#14) Statement of Operations for Small Business filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (ALL SCHEDULES FILED) Modified on 3/22/2021 (wdh). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 25. Notice Date 03/11/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/10/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#18) Status Report for Subchapter V(related document:#6 Notice of Hearing -(No Upload)) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#5

(#16) Document re: Notice Regarding Telephonic 341 Meeting of Creditors (related document:#5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

4 #2

Verified Statement of Mark Politan

4 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#3

Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Order to Show Cause Vacated - All Missing Documents Filed (related document(s): #3 Show Cause) (ntp) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#1

Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11823) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A42258338, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/21/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference Minute of Hearing Held Before Judge Rosemary Gambardella, OUTCOME:Concluded (related document(s): #6 Notice of Hearing -(No Upload)) (ntp) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order Granting Application to Employ Scura, Wigfield, Heyer & Stevens as Counsel for Debtor (Related Doc #15). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/19/2021. (ntp) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Status Report for Subchapter V(related document:#6 Notice of Hearing -(No Upload)) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Certificate of Service (related document:#15 Application for Retention filed by Debtor GreenKarma, LLC) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Document re: Notice Regarding Telephonic 341 Meeting of Creditors (related document:#5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Order to Show Cause Vacated - All Missing Documents Filed (related document(s): #3 Show Cause) (ntp) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrection Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#15 Application for Retention filed by Debtor GreenKarma, LLC). Type of Error: No certificate of service attached, filed by Stevens, David. Please correct and file a certificate of service with the court. (ntp) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Application For Retention of Professional David L. Stevens Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. The follow up deadline is 03/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Professional #2 Proposed Order) (Stevens, David). NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED Modified on 3/29/2021 (ntp). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Statement of Operations for Small Business filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. (Stevens, David) (ALL SCHEDULES FILED) Modified on 3/22/2021 (wdh). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/11/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 25. Notice Date 03/11/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/10/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Chapter 11 Status Conference. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (LVJ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11.Trustee Mark Politan appointed to case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/7/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 5/14/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/1/2021. (rah) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appointment of Mark Politan as Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee. U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Mark Politan) (United States Trustee, by Martha Hildebrandt, Assistant United States Trustee) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11823) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A42258338, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/5/2021. Hearing scheduled for 3/30/2021 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (lc) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of GreenKarma, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/3/2021. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fran B. Steele