This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 06:32:01 (UTC).

Great American Treating, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Great American Treating, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Joshua Searcy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-60078

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Joshua Searcy

 

Party Details

Debtor

Great American Treating, Inc.

Po Box 672

Winona, TX 75792

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Glen E. Patrick

Attorney at Patrick Law Offices

Po Box 938

Lindale, TX 75771

Us Trustee Attorney

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: (To replace the incorrect pdf attached to the 4/7/21 Amended Schedule E/F) Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. Document Due 05/5/2021. (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#19

(#19) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#18 Order Granting Debtor-in-Possession's Application to Employ Attorneys (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Attorneys with Pre-Petition Retainer Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Matrix # 2 Affidavit # 3 Disclosure of Compensation # 4 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Great American Treating, Inc.). (bd)). Notice Date 04/15/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#18

(#18) Order Granting Debtor-in-Possession's Application to Employ Attorneys (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Attorneys with Pre-Petition Retainer Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Matrix # 2 Affidavit # 3 Disclosure of Compensation # 4 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Great American Treating, Inc.). (bd) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#17

(#17) Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Removing Industrial Wood Technology as a Creditor Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. Document Due 04/14/2021. (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

16 #5

Proposed Order

16 #4

Disclosure of Compensation

16 #3

Affidavit

16 #2

Matrix

16 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Exhibit - to SOFA #22

6 #2

Exhibit A - Real Property

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Amended Voluntary Petition. Amendment:(to Delete Subchapter V Election) Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Great American Treating, Inc., Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/2/2021.Document Due 03/11/2021. (Attachments: # 1 List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims # 2 Matrix) filed by Debtor Great American Treating, Inc.). Document Due 03/17/2021. (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Laurie A. Spindler) Filed by Smith County (Spindler, Laurie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#2

(#2) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (dd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

1 #3

Matrix

1 #2

List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims

#1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: (To replace the incorrect pdf attached to the 4/7/21 Amended Schedule E/F) Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. Document Due 05/5/2021. (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#18 Order Granting Debtor-in-Possession's Application to Employ Attorneys (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Attorneys with Pre-Petition Retainer Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Matrix # 2 Affidavit # 3 Disclosure of Compensation # 4 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Great American Treating, Inc.). (bd)). Notice Date 04/15/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order Granting Debtor-in-Possession's Application to Employ Attorneys (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Attorneys with Pre-Petition Retainer Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Matrix # 2 Affidavit # 3 Disclosure of Compensation # 4 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Great American Treating, Inc.). (bd) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#17 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Removing Industrial Wood Technology as a Creditor Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. Document Due 04/14/2021. filed by Debtor Great American Treating, Inc.). (bd) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Amended Schedules and/or Amended Matrix(# 21-60078) [misc,amdscall] ( 32.00) filing fee. Receipt number A12009992, amount $ 32.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule E/F, Amendment: Removing Industrial Wood Technology as a Creditor Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. Document Due 04/14/2021. (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 4/7/21 Filed by US Trustee (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Application to Employ Attorneys with Pre-Petition Retainer Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Matrix #2 Affidavit #3 Disclosure of Compensation #4 Proposed Order) (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 0.00* Amount Paid $ 3150.00 Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (Patrick, Glen) Modified on 3/25/2021 (bd). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Request for Notices Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (bd) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Amended Matrix (Adding/Deleting Creditors)(Fee Required)(# 21-60078) [misc,amdcm] ( 32.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11976223, amount $ 32.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Creditor Matrix, Adding Creditors Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. Document Due 03/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - to SOFA #22) (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. Document Due 03/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Real Property) (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Voluntary Petition. Amendment:(to Delete Subchapter V Election) Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Great American Treating, Inc., Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/2/2021.Document Due 03/11/2021. (Attachments: # 1 List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims # 2 Matrix) filed by Debtor Great American Treating, Inc.). Document Due 03/17/2021. (Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Laurie A. Spindler) Filed by Smith County (Spindler, Laurie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#3) Matrix Filed Electronically by Great American Treating, Inc. (dd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Great American Treating, Inc. (dd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-60078) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11970218, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Great American Treating, Inc., Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/2/2021.Document Due 03/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims #2 Matrix)(Patrick, Glen) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman