This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 05:18:06

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Gloria E Ruiz in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 6:19-BK-19023
  • Filing Date 10/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 7
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Wayne E. Johnson
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • Debtor Gloria E Ruiz
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • US Trustee United States Trustee (RS)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Trustee Charles W Daff (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
2 #1

Incorrect PDF

Fees Apply
#2

Ch 7 First Mtg I/J No POC

Fees Apply
1 #5

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

Fees Apply
1 #4

Case Com Def Notice

Fees Apply
1 #3

Incorrect PDF

Fees Apply
1 #2

Incorrect PDF

Fees Apply
#1

Main Document

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 14. Receipt Number 60147781. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Gloria E Ruiz . (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Gloria E Ruiz Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 11/14/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 10/29/2019. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 10/29/2019. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 10/29/2019. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 10/29/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Romero, Kimberly) CORRECTION: Incorrect debtor's address entered. Updated address to reflect PDF. Modified on 10/15/2019 (Zamora, Ed). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.