This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/13/2022 at 06:33:40 (UTC).

Geoffrey McCormick Lynn and Lisa Ann Lynn

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 Geoffrey McCormick Lynn and Lisa Ann Lynn was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Erik P. Kimball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-BK-14606

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Erik P. Kimball

 

Party Details

Debtors

Geoffrey McCormick Lynn

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Lisa Ann Lynn

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

David L. Merrill, Esq.

Attorney at Harbour Financial Center

2401 Pga Boulevard Suite 280M

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Us Trustee Attorney

Heidi A Feinman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

44 #2

Mailing Matrix 8-4-22

44 #1

Main Document

#43

(#43) Order Granting Employment of Debtors in Possession's Attorney (Re: #27). (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

40 #2

Exhibit A

40 #1

Main Document

27 #5

Mailing Matrix

27 #4

Exhibit

27 #3

Proposed Order

27 #2

Affidavit

27 #1

Main Document

#9

(#9) Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP. (AIS Data Services (ANRawal)) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#8

(#40) Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled/Continued Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee (Re: #8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 8/2/2022 at 08:30 AM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-915-4419 passcode 6071331. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#7

(#7) Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Synchrony Bank. (PRA Receivables Management (VSmith)) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#6

(#6) Order Authorizing Individual Chapter 11 Debtor(s) to Manage Financial Affairs . (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 6/22/2022]. Conforming Official Bankruptcy Petition Form Due 6/22/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/28/2022. Schedules A-J due 6/28/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 6/28/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 6/28/2022. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due: 6/28/2022. Payment Advices due for Debtor 6/28/2022. Payment Advices due for Joint Debtor 6/28/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 6/28/2022]. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course by Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Geoffrey McCormick Lynn , Joint Debtor Lisa Ann Lynn. (Extracted from DE#1) (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Hampton Peterson Esq Filed by Creditor Palm Beach County Tax Collector. (Peterson, Hampton) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 08/23/2022. (Merrill, David) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Certificate of Service by Attorney David L. Merrill Esq. (Re: #43 Order on Application to Employ). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix 8-4-22) (Merrill, David) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Order Granting Employment of Debtors in Possession's Attorney (Re: #27). (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docket(#42) Until Further Notice, the United States Trustee Will Not Appoint a Committee of Creditors Pursuant to 11 USC Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docket(#41) Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled/Continued Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee (Re: #8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 8/2/2022 at 08:30 AM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-915-4419 passcode 6071331. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Certificate of Service by Attorney David L. Merrill Esq. (Re: #38 Order (Generic)). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Merrill, David) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Order Establishing Plan and Disclosure Statement Filing Deadlines and Addressing Related Matters. Deadline to File Plan and Disclosure Statement is 10/12/2022 (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Certificate of Service by Attorney David L. Merrill Esq. (Re: #10 Order Setting Status Hearing/Conference). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Merrill, David) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Danielle Burns Filed by Creditor TD Bank NA. (Burns, Danielle) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Certificate of Service by Attorney David L. Merrill Esq. (Re: #33 Notice of Hearing). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Merrill, David) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP. (AIS Data Services (ANRawal)) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Debtor: First date set for hearing on confirmation of plan. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 7/22/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 9/20/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 8/23/2022. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-14606) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41031889. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Synchrony Bank. (PRA Receivables Management (VSmith)) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Authorizing Individual Chapter 11 Debtor(s) to Manage Financial Affairs . (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 6/22/2022]. Conforming Official Bankruptcy Petition Form Due 6/22/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/28/2022. Schedules A-J due 6/28/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 6/28/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 6/28/2022. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due: 6/28/2022. Payment Advices due for Debtor 6/28/2022. Payment Advices due for Joint Debtor 6/28/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 6/28/2022]. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course by Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Geoffrey McCormick Lynn , Joint Debtor Lisa Ann Lynn. (Extracted from DE#1) (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Hampton Peterson Esq Filed by Creditor Palm Beach County Tax Collector. (Peterson, Hampton) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtor(s) Social Security Number(s) [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] Filed by Debtor Geoffrey McCormick Lynn, Joint Debtor Lisa Ann Lynn. (Merrill, David) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 08/23/2022. (Merrill, David) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heidi Ann Feinman(Designation Retained)