This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/14/2020 at 07:01:04 (UTC).

Gavilan Resources HoldCo, LLC Jointly Administered under 20-32656.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Gavilan Resources HoldCo, LLC Jointly Administered under 20-32656 was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin Isgur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-32658

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Marvin Isgur

 

Party Details

Debtors

Gavilan Resources HoldCo, LLC Jointly Administered under 20-32656.

Gavilan Resources HoldCo, LLC

920 Memorial City Way, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77024

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Alfredo R Perez

Attorney at Weil Gotshal et al

700 Louisiana, Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Brenda Lynn Funk

Attorney at Weil Gotshal et al

700 Louisiana, Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Ex. A - Proposed Order

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketJudge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (LinhthuDo) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#4 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/20/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/20/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2020
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-32656 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) (Entered: 05/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Joint Administration under 20-32656. Signed on 5/17/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 05/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 05/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency Motion of Debtors Pusuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) and Local Rule 1015-1 for Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor Gavilan Resources HoldCo, LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Proposed Order) (Funk, Brenda) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-32658) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22123619. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Gavilan Resources HoldCo, LLC. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brenda Lynn Funk

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfredo R Perez