This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/30/2021 at 06:31:54 (UTC).

Galaxy Brands, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Galaxy Brands, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11201

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

John T. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Debtor

Galaxy Brands, LLC

1407 Broadway38Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

844 King Street, SU 2207

Not Classified By Court

Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC

222 N. Pacific Coast Highwaysuite 300

El Segundo, CA 90245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Laura Davis Jones

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

919 N. Market Street, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Creditor Matrix

#3

(#3) Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Sequential Brands Group, Inc., SQBG, Inc., Sequential Licensing, Inc., William Rast Licensing, LLC, Heeling Sports Limited, Brand Matter, LLC, SBG FM, LLC, Galaxy Brands LLC, The Basketball Marketing Company, Inc., American Sporting Goods Corporation, LNT Brands LLC, Joes Holdings LLC, Gaiam Brand Holdco, LLC, Gaiam Americas, Inc., SBG-Gaiam Holdings, LLC, SBG Universe Brands, LLC, and GBT Promotions LLC. All further pleadings and other papers in such cases shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in Sequential Brands Group, Inc., Case No. 21-11194 (JTD). Signed on 9/1/2021. (RC) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Galaxy Brands, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Galaxy Brands, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Galaxy Brands, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Galaxy Brands, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Sequential Brands Group, Inc., SQBG, Inc., Sequential Licensing, Inc., William Rast Licensing, LLC, Heeling Sports Limited, Brand Matter, LLC, SBG FM, LLC, Galaxy Brands LLC, The Basketball Marketing Company, Inc., American Sporting Goods Corporation, LNT Brands LLC, Joes Holdings LLC, Gaiam Brand Holdco, LLC, Gaiam Americas, Inc., SBG-Gaiam Holdings, LLC, SBG Universe Brands, LLC, and GBT Promotions LLC. All further pleadings and other papers in such cases shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in Sequential Brands Group, Inc., Case No. 21-11194 (JTD). Signed on 9/1/2021. (RC) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11201) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10474580, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketJudge John T. Dorsey added to case (LB) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Galaxy Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Creditor Matrix) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Davis Jones