This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 05:10:59

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Fred R Hoerr in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:19-BK-22134
  • Filing Date 10/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 7
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Ernest M. Robles
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • US Trustee United States Trustee (LA)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Fred R Hoerr
  • Represented By
    • Michael F Chekian
  • Trustee John P Pringle (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
7 #2

Ntc Pymnt Fees Instlmnt

Fees Apply
7 #1

Main Document

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debto...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Fred R...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on ...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amou...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Installment Filing Fee - $20.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20237738. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#7) Order Denying Application To Proceed in forma pauperis and Notice for payment of filing fees in installments. First Installment Amount: $20.00, Second Installment Amount: $105.00, Third Installment Amount: $105.00, Final Installment Amount: $105.00. (Related Doc #6). Signed on 10/15/2019. First Installment Payment due by 10/15/2019. Second Installment Payment due by 11/15/2019. Third Installment Payment due by 12/16/2019. Final Installment Payment due by 1/15/2020. (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Fred R Hoerr (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Fred R Hoerr . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Fred R Hoerr . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Fred R Hoerr . (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/18/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 01/17/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/17/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Fred R Hoerr (Tom, Bock) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.