This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 06:46:58 (UTC).

Foxtrot United, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Foxtrot United, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Utah Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Kimball Mosier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-22838

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Utah Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

R. Kimball Mosier

 

Party Details

Debtor

Foxtrot United, LLC

265 W Center St.

Provo, UT 84601

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

Washington Federal Bank Bldg., 405 South Main Street, Suite 300

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Darren B. Neilson

Attorney at Neilson Law Group

2150 S 1300 E, Suite 360

Salt Lake City, UT 84106

Brian M. Rothschild

Attorney at Parsons Behle & Latimer

201 S. Main St. Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Us Trustee Attorney

John T. Morgan

Attorney at US Trustees Office

Washington Federal Bank Building, 405 South Main Street, Suite 300

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) USTR's Minute Entry (341) filed by USTR, Statement of United States Trustee Regarding Creditors' Committee: There were too few unsecured creditors willing to serve for the United States Trustee to form a Creditors' Committee Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Morgan, John) (EOD: 06/23/2020)

#7

(#7) Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) (EOD: 05/26/2020)

#6

(#6) 341 Meeting Notice (see image for details) and BNC Certificate of Service. (related document(s): Notice Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12) Notice Date 05/16/2020. (Admin.) (EOD: 05/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Amended Document (related document(s):#3 Application to Employ Attorney) Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) (EOD: 05/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Affidavit/Declaration (related document(s):#3 Application to Employ Attorney) Declaration of Darren Neilson in Support of Application to Employ Parsons Behle and Latimer as Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) (EOD: 05/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Application to Employ Parsons Behle and Latimer as Attorney Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Rothschild, Brian) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Rothschild, Brian) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) USTR's Minute Entry (341) filed by USTR, Statement of United States Trustee Regarding Creditors' Committee: There were too few unsecured creditors willing to serve for the United States Trustee to form a Creditors' Committee Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Morgan, John) (EOD: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) (EOD: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 341 Meeting Notice (see image for details) and BNC Certificate of Service. (related document(s): Notice Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12) Notice Date 05/16/2020. (Admin.) (EOD: 05/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/18/2020 at Chapter 11 341 Mtg Teleconference Line. Proofs of Claims due by 9/16/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/9/2020. (jtt) (EOD: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Document (related document(s):#3 Application to Employ Attorney) Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) (EOD: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit/Declaration (related document(s):#3 Application to Employ Attorney) Declaration of Darren Neilson in Support of Application to Employ Parsons Behle and Latimer as Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) (EOD: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Employ Parsons Behle and Latimer as Attorney Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Rothschild, Brian) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCreditor(s) uploaded (18 creditors). (Rothschild, Brian) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by United States Trustee. (Morgan, John) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-22838) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 23586158, Amount $1717.00 (Re: Doc#1). (U.S. Treasury) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Foxtrot United, LLC. (Rothschild, Brian) (EOD: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T. Morgan