This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2020 at 06:32:51 (UTC).

Fig & Olive Holding LLC

Case Summary

On 07/03/2020 Fig Olive Holding LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean H. Lane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-BK-22810

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Sean H. Lane

 

Party Details

Debtors

F&O Scarsdale LLC

Fig & Olive Holding LLC

254 W. 31St Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building, 201 Varick Street, Room 1006

New York, NY 10014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Robert Leslie Rattet

Attorney at Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP

605 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10158

James B. Glucksman

Attorney at Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP

605 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10158

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Exhibit Org Chart

2 #3

Exhibit Proposed Order

3 #1

Notice of Ch11 Mtg C/P

3 #2

Notice of Ch11 Mtg C/P: Notice Recipients

#4

#5

#6

7 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Exhibit Notes To Schedules Etc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Robert Leslie Rattet on behalf of Fig & Olive Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notes To Schedules Etc.)(Rattet, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance as Attorneys for Debtor filed by James B. Glucksman on behalf of Fig & Olive Holding LLC. (Glucksman, James) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCase Joint Administration - An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and jointadministration of the Chapter 11 cases commenced by F&O Scarsdale LLC, Et Al. The docketin Case No. 20-22808 should be consulted for all matters affecting the above listed cases (Correa, Mimi). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) (Related Doc #3)) . Notice Date 07/11/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Signed On 7/10/2020, Directing The Joint Administration Of The Chapter 11 Cases For Procedural Purposes Only. (Related Doc #2) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase Related to 20-22808 (Walker, Justin). (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/13/2020 at 01:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Walker, Justin). (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • DocketJudge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Robert Leslie Rattet on behalf of Fig & Olive Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Org Chart #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Rattet, Robert) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-22810) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14112907. Fee amount 1717.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 07/17/2020. Schedule D due 07/17/2020. Schedule E/F due 07/17/2020. Schedule G due 07/17/2020. Schedule H due 07/17/2020. Schedule I due 07/17/2020. Schedule J due 07/17/2020. Schedule J-2 due 07/17/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 07/17/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/17/2020. Atty Disclosure State. due 07/17/2020. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 07/17/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 07/17/2020, Filed by Robert Leslie Rattet of Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP on behalf of F&O Scarsdale LLC. (Rattet, Robert) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Rattet

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James B. Glucksman Esq.