This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2021 at 06:31:29 (UTC).

Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judges overseeing this case are Bill Parker and Joshua Searcy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-BK-90035

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judges

Bill Parker

Joshua Searcy

 

Party Details

Debtor

Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.

915 E. Grande Blvd., Apt. 2201

Tyler, TX 75703

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Trustee

H. Thomas Moran (SBRA V), III

Gilchrist, TX 77616

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Joyce W. Lindauer

Attorney at Joyce Lindauer, Attorney

1412 Main Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

Us Trustee Attorney

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) Operating Report for Filing Period February 2021 Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified on 4/21/2021 (srb). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#54

(#54) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#51 Agreed Final Order For Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Section 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Providing Adequate Protection and Granting Liens and Security Interests (RE: related document(s)#17 Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Red Oak Capital Holdings, LLC Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (srb)). Notice Date 04/16/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#51

(#51) Agreed Final Order For Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Section 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Providing Adequate Protection and Granting Liens and Security Interests (RE: related document(s)#17 Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Red Oak Capital Holdings, LLC Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (srb) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

40 #3

Proposed Order

#37

(#56) Declaration for Electronic Filing. (DOES NOT CONTAIN DEBTOR'S ACTUAL SIGNATURE.) Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#36 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. Document Due 03/24/2021. filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc., #37 Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. Document Due 03/24/2021. (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified text on 3/18/2021 (jj). filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified on 4/22/2021 (srb). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#36

(#56) Declaration for Electronic Filing. (DOES NOT CONTAIN DEBTOR'S ACTUAL SIGNATURE.) Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#36 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. Document Due 03/24/2021. filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc., #37 Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. Document Due 03/24/2021. (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified text on 3/18/2021 (jj). filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified on 4/22/2021 (srb). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

17 #3

Exhibit B - Budget

17 #2

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

17 #1

Main Document

#8

Status Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc., #8 Notice of Status Conference by Virtual Hearing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188(a) (md) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

7 #2

Notice of Ch11 Mtg C/P SubCh V

7 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) Telephonic Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/19/2021 at 10:15 AM. Proofs of Claims due by 5/5/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/23/2021. (md) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

5 #2

Affidavit of Trustee

5 #1

Main Document

#4

(#9) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#4 Order Setting 7-Day Dismissal Deadline For Failure to File Required Documents Accompanying Petition. (jj)). Notice Date 02/26/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#2

(#2) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#1

Status Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc., #8 Notice of Status Conference by Virtual Hearing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188(a) (md) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Declaration for Electronic Filing. (DOES NOT CONTAIN DEBTOR'S ACTUAL SIGNATURE.) Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#36 Original Schedules: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. Document Due 03/24/2021. filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc., #37 Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. Document Due 03/24/2021. (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified text on 3/18/2021 (jj). filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified on 4/22/2021 (srb). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Operating Report for Filing Period February 2021 Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified on 4/21/2021 (srb). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc., #8 Notice of Status Conference by Virtual Hearing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188(a) (md) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#51 Agreed Final Order For Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Section 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Providing Adequate Protection and Granting Liens and Security Interests (RE: related document(s)#17 Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Red Oak Capital Holdings, LLC Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (srb)). Notice Date 04/16/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#49 Order Granting Motion For Authority To Enter Into Insurance Premium Finance Agreement Nunc Pro Tunc(RE: related document(s)#40 Motion For Authority To Enter Into Insurance Premium Finance Agreement Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (srb)). Notice Date 04/15/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#48 Order Granting Debtor's Application to Employ Counsel (RE: related document(s)#42 Application to Employ Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (srb)). Notice Date 04/15/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Agreed Final Order For Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Section 363 of The Bankruptcy Code and Providing Adequate Protection and Granting Liens and Security Interests (RE: related document(s)#17 Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Red Oak Capital Holdings, LLC Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (srb) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Held: Motion Granted Subject to Court Review of Proposed Agreed Order Uploaded 4/14/21 . (RE: related document(s)#17 Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral of Red Oak Capital Holdings, LLC filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (md) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE: #17 Motion to Use Cash Collateral UPLOADED 2021-04-14 08:35 (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE: #17 Motion to Use Cash Collateral UPLOADED 2021-04-13 17:16 (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#4 Order Setting 7-Day Dismissal Deadline For Failure to File Required Documents Accompanying Petition. (jj)). Notice Date 02/26/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Status Conference by Virtual Hearing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188(a). Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2021 at 02:00 PM at Virtual Hearing Location (BMT Apr. 19). Debtor shall file a Consensual Reorganization Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 4/5/2021. (md) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Telephonic Meeting of Creditors - Renotice Only - 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/19/2021 at 10:15 AM. (md) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Telephonic Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/19/2021 at 10:15 AM. Proofs of Claims due by 5/5/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/23/2021. (md) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice To Trustee Tom Moran Of Selection And Appointment With Trustee's Acceptance. Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Trustee)(Vardeman, John) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting 7-Day Dismissal Deadline For Failure to File Required Documents Accompanying Petition. (jj) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-90035) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11956445, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc., Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/25/2021.Document Due 03/3/2021. filed by Debtor Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc.). (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc. (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Fleurdelis Hospitality, Inc., Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/25/2021.Document Due 03/3/2021.(Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman