This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/21/2022 at 07:01:05 (UTC).

FBN Transportation LLC

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 FBN Transportation LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine J. Furay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10829

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine J. Furay

 

Party Details

Debtor

FBN Transportation LLC

Po Box 126

Athens, WI 54411

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee's Office

780 Regent Street, Suite 304

Madison, WI 53715

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

John P. Driscoll

Attorney at Krekeler Strother, S.C.

2901 West Beltline Highway, Suite 301

Madison, WI 53713

Us Trustee Attorney

Tiffany E. Rodriguez

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

780 Regent Street, Suite 304

Madison, WI 53715

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition [ Fee Amount $ 1738] filed by FBN Transportation LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due 08/18/2022. Incomplete Filings due 06/3/2022. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#2

(#2) Declaration : Resolution of Members of FBN Transportation LLC & Statement Regarding Authority to Sign & File Petition filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC. Related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Tiffany E. Rodriguez on behalf of U.S. Trustee's Office. (Rodriguez, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC.. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#8

(#8) Motion to Expedite Hearing on the Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay with Declaration in Support of the motions filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC. Related document(s)#7 Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice of Hearing filed by FBN Transportation LLC. Related document(s)#7, #8 Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing on the Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay with Declaration in Support of the motions filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#10

(#10) Proposed Order (related document(s)#7 Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC) filed by Attorney John P. Driscoll of Krekeler Strother, S.C. on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC . Order to be signed on or after 5/27/2022. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#11

(#11) Proposed Order (related document(s)#8 Motion to Expedite Hearing on the Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay with Declaration in Support of the motions filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC) filed by Attorney John P. Driscoll of Krekeler Strother, S.C. on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC . Order to be signed on or after 5/27/2022. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#12

(#12) Proof of Service filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC. Related document(s)#9, #11, #10, #7, #8 Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing on the Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay with Declaration in Support of the motions filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proof of Service filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC. Related document(s)#9, #11, #10, #7, #8 Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing on the Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay with Declaration in Support of the motions filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Proposed Order filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Order (related document(s)#8 Motion to Expedite Hearing on the Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay with Declaration in Support of the motions filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC) filed by Attorney John P. Driscoll of Krekeler Strother, S.C. on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC . Order to be signed on or after 5/27/2022. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Order (related document(s)#7 Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC) filed by Attorney John P. Driscoll of Krekeler Strother, S.C. on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC . Order to be signed on or after 5/27/2022. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Hearing filed by FBN Transportation LLC. Related document(s)#7, #8 Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC, Motion to Expedite Hearing on the Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay with Declaration in Support of the motions filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Expedite Hearing on the Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay with Declaration in Support of the motions filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC. Related document(s)#7 Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Approve : Debtor's Motion to Modify the Automatic Stay filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC.. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#6) SB Statement of Operations due by 5/27/2022. SB Balance Sheet due by 5/27/2022. SB Federal Income Tax Return due by 5/27/2022. SB Cash Flow Statement due by 5/27/2022. Notice of Small Business Deadlines. (Madison, Tibby) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Tiffany E. Rodriguez on behalf of U.S. Trustee's Office. (Rodriguez, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) Tax Documents for the Year 2020 for State of Wisconsin filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) Tax Documents for the Year 2020 for Federal tax return filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration : Resolution of Members of FBN Transportation LLC & Statement Regarding Authority to Sign & File Petition filed by John P. Driscoll on behalf of FBN Transportation LLC. Related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor FBN Transportation LLC. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 1-22-10829) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A8667218, amount $1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (Driscoll, John) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition [ Fee Amount $ 1738] filed by FBN Transportation LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due 08/18/2022. Incomplete Filings due 06/3/2022. (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FBN Transportation, LLC, a Wisconsin Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant