This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/11/2021 at 06:32:02 (UTC).

Eztopeliz, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Eztopeliz, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen S. Jennemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-03674

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen S. Jennemann

 

Party Details

Debtor

EZTOPELIZ, LLC

850 Trailwood Ave

Titusville, FL 32796

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

400 West Washington Street, SU 1100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Michael A Nardella

Attorney at Nardella & Nardella, PLLC

135 West Central Boulevard, Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32801

Jonathan Sykes

Attorney at Nardella & Nardella, PLLC

135 W. Central Blvd., Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32801

Us Trustee Attorney

Audrey M Aleskovsky

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

400 West Washington St, SU 1100

 

Court Documents

46 #7

Exhibit 13

46 #5

Exhibit 11

46 #4

Exhibit 10

46 #3

Exhibit 9

46 #2

Exhibit 8

#36

30 #6

Exhibit E

30 #5

Exhibit D

30 #4

Exhibit C

30 #2

Exhibit A

30 #1

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Proposed Exhibits ranging from 8 to 13. 7 documents attached filed on behalf of Eztopeliz, LLC, HLI Investments and Funding-Fund 2, LLC. Joint Exhibits, Creditor Exhibits and Debtor's Exhibits (related document(s) #30 , #36 ). (ADIclerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Proposed Exhibits ranging from 1 to 7. 8 documents attached filed on behalf of Eztopeliz, LLC, HLI Investments and Funding-Fund 2, LLC. Joint Exhibits, Creditor Exhibits and Debtor's Exhibits (related document(s) #30 , #36 ). (ADIclerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Proposed Exhibits ranging from 16 to 16. 2 documents attached filed on behalf of Eztopeliz, LLC, HLI Investments and Funding-Fund 2, LLC. Joint Exhibits, Creditor Exhibits and Debtor's Exhibits (related document(s) #30 , #36 ). (ADIclerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #42)). Notice Date 09/29/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #39)). Notice Date 09/24/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2021 Filed by Michael A Nardella on behalf of Debtor Eztopeliz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment) (Nardella, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Order Scheduling Trial VIA ZOOM (related document(s)#37, #30, #36). Re: HLI Investments and Funding-Fund 2, LLCs Motion for Prospective Relief from Stay Re: vacant land at 4600 & 4650 Dixie Highway NE, Port Malabar Unit 1, Palm Bay, Florida, and Debtors Response. Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 10:00 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Vivianne). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Objection to Claim as Scheduled of HLI Investments and Funding-Fund 2, LLC. Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Debtor Eztopeliz, LLC (related document(s)#35). Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 10:00 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Sykes, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Scheduled for 10/15/2021 10:00 AM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Objection to Claim(s). Claim as Scheduled of HLI Investments and Funding-Fund 2, LLC. Contains negative notice. Doc #35. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Jonathan Sykes is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, the preparation, filing and service must be done immediately. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Telephonic Appearance Requirement: Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Colton and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, and McEwen, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). Beginning Wednesday, September 1, 2021, for Judges Jennemann and Vaughan, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com) by 5:00 p.m. the business day preceding the hearing. NOTE: All parties should proceed to the website and select 'Sign Up'. For unrepresented parties only, before submitting the completed form, you must select 'I am not an attorney' and 'Certified Indigent'. Once the information is submitted you will receive an email with further instructions. Should the Court decide to hold this hearing by Zoom, the Court will enter a subsequent Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearing. For hearings held by Zoom, parties should arrange to attend via Zoom only. Parties that wish to listen only, who do not anticipate active participation, or who lack technology to participate by video may participate telephonically only. (related document(s)#35). (Dkt) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2021 at 10:15 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Nadia) Modified on 8/13/2021 (Nadia). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 8/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Nadia) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A,B, D-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Management Summary, Corporate Ownership Statement . (Ahyen) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/13/2021 at 11:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 10/21/2021. (Ahyen) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Karen S. Jennemann, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (autojtr-orl, orl) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:21-bk-03674) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number 68027780, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). List of 20 Largest Creditors. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Michael A Nardella on behalf of EZTOPELIZ, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/10/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 12/10/2021. (Nardella, Michael) Modified on 8/13/2021 (Ahyen). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Audrey M Aleskovsky