This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2021 at 05:06:54 (UTC).

Eytan Rosenberg

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Eytan Rosenberg was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen Tighe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11692

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

Maureen Tighe

 

Party Details

Debtor

Eytan Rosenberg

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Trustee

Nancy J Zamora (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Anthony Almaz

Attorney at Antonus Law PC

100 E Macarthur Blvd Unit 356

Santa Ana, CA 92707

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2021 at 09:30 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) Cert. of Financial Management due by 1/18/2022. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 1/18/2022. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Eytan Rosenberg. (Almaz, Anthony) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(# 1:21-bk-11692) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53502865. Fee amount 338.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2021 at 09:30 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) Cert. of Financial Management due by 1/18/2022. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 1/18/2022. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Eytan Rosenberg. (Almaz, Anthony) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Eytan Rosenberg. (Almaz, Anthony) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Eytan Rosenberg Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 11/15/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2021. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2021. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2021. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2021. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2021. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 10/29/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2021. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 10/29/2021. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 10/29/2021. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 10/29/2021. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/29/2021. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) due 10/29/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 10/29/2021. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2021. (Almaz, Anthony) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant