This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/13/2021 at 06:31:22 (UTC).

Evergreen Gardens I LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Evergreen Gardens I LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11609

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Martin Glenn

 

Party Details

Debtor

Evergreen Gardens I LLC

12 Spencer Street, 3Rd Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11205

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building

Not Classified By Court

Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. Claims Agent

6201 15Th Avenue, Www.Donlinrecano.Com

Brooklyn, NY 11219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Matthew Paul Goren

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Gary Holtzer

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc #18)) . Notice Date 11/03/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#20

(#20) Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001(e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s)#17, #18) filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#19

(#19) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc #17)) . Notice Date 10/31/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

18 #3

transfer of claim: Notice Recipients

18 #2

transfer of claim

18 #1

Main Document

17 #3

transfer of claim: Notice Recipients

17 #2

transfer of claim

17 #1

Main Document

#16

(#16) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc #13)) . Notice Date 10/20/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

13 #2

transfer of claim

13 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) Order signed on 9/15/2021 Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases (Related Doc #4). Procedural consolidation and jointadministration of the chapter 11 cases of Evergreen GardensMezz LLC, 21-10335; Evergreen Gardens I LLC, 21-11609; and EvergreenGardens II LLC, 21-11610. The docket in Case No. 21-10335 (MG) should be consulted for all matters affecting the cases. (Anderson, Deanna) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information / Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a), 342(a), and 521 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007 and 2002(a)(1) for Entry of an Order (I) Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs; and (II) Authorizing Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated List of Creditors and (B) Redact Certain Personal Identification Information for Tenants filed by Matthew Paul Goren on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Goren, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#4

(#6) Order signed on 9/15/2021 Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases (Related Doc #4). Procedural consolidation and jointadministration of the chapter 11 cases of Evergreen GardensMezz LLC, 21-10335; Evergreen Gardens I LLC, 21-11609; and EvergreenGardens II LLC, 21-11610. The docket in Case No. 21-10335 (MG) should be consulted for all matters affecting the cases. (Anderson, Deanna) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 : Declaration of Asaf Ravid Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 in Support of Subsidiary Debtors' Chapter 11 Petitions and Related Relief (related document(s)#1) Filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement and List of Equity Security Holders Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1), 1007(a)(3), and 7007.1. (related document(s)#1) Filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#1

(#3) Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 : Declaration of Asaf Ravid Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 in Support of Subsidiary Debtors' Chapter 11 Petitions and Related Relief (related document(s)#1) Filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc #18)) . Notice Date 11/03/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001(e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s)#17, #18) filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc #17)) . Notice Date 10/31/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (NON CLAIMS AGENT CASES)(# 21-11609-mg) [claims,740] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15550684. Fee amount 26.00. (Re: Doc #18) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: Metro High Tech Steel And Builders To CRG Financial LLC filed by CRG Financial LLC on behalf of CRG Financial LLC. (CRG Financial LLC) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (NON CLAIMS AGENT CASES)(# 21-11609-mg) [claims,740] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15548523. Fee amount 26.00. (Re: Doc #17) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: Chutes Enterprises To CRG Financial LLC filed by CRG Financial LLC on behalf of CRG Financial LLC. (CRG Financial LLC) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc #13)) . Notice Date 10/20/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s)#13) filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Amended Schedules filed:, Schedule G - Non-Individual / Amendment to Schedule G for Evergreen Gardens I LLC (Case No. 21-11609 (MG)) Filed by Matthew Paul Goren on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Goren, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAn order has been entered in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule1015(b) directing the procedural consolidation and jointadministration of the of the chapter 11 cases of Evergreen GardensMezz LLC (0416); Evergreen Gardens I LLC (2211); and EvergreenGardens II LLC (6782). The Debtors principal offices are locatedat 199 Lee Avenue, Suite 693, Brooklyn, New York 11211. Thedocket in Case No. 21-10335 (MG) should be consulted for allmatters affecting the cases. (Cappiello, Karen). (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order signed on 9/15/2021 Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases (Related Doc #4). Procedural consolidation and jointadministration of the chapter 11 cases of Evergreen GardensMezz LLC, 21-10335; Evergreen Gardens I LLC, 21-11609; and EvergreenGardens II LLC, 21-11610. The docket in Case No. 21-10335 (MG) should be consulted for all matters affecting the cases. (Anderson, Deanna) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information / Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a), 342(a), and 521 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007 and 2002(a)(1) for Entry of an Order (I) Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and Statements of Financial Affairs; and (II) Authorizing Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated List of Creditors and (B) Redact Certain Personal Identification Information for Tenants filed by Matthew Paul Goren on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Goren, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Joint Administration / Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Matthew Paul Goren on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Goren, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 : Declaration of Asaf Ravid Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 in Support of Subsidiary Debtors' Chapter 11 Petitions and Related Relief (related document(s)#1) Filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement and List of Equity Security Holders Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1), 1007(a)(3), and 7007.1. (related document(s)#1) Filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11609) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15495029. Fee amount 1738.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Related to: Case Number: 21-10335, Evergreen Gardens Mezz LLC. (Porter, Minnie). (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketJudge Martin Glenn added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 09/28/2021. Schedule C due 09/28/2021. Schedule D due 09/28/2021. Schedule E/F due 09/28/2021. Schedule G due 09/28/2021. Schedule H due 09/28/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 09/28/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 09/28/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 09/28/2021, Filed by Gary Holtzer of Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Evergreen Gardens I LLC. (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Holtzer