This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 10:47:53

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Erin M Burke in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Ohio Northern Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-BK-31587
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 7
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE
  • Courthouse Ohio Northern Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • Debtor Erin M. Burke
  • Represented By
    • Robert Zelvy
  • Trustee Patti Baumgartner-Novak
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors w/ BNC Certificate o...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadl...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Erin M. Burke. ...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Erin ...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Erin M...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amou...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • (#8) Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Patti Baumgartner-Novak, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Meeting of creditors held and concluded. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 3 months. Assets Abandoned(without deducting any secured claims): $ 3381.90, Assets Exempt: $ 28.10, Claims Scheduled: $ 79464.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment(without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 79464.00. (Baumgartner-Novak, Patti) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#7) Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 7/30/2019 at 1:45 PM at Ohio Building, Toledo. (Baumgartner-Novak, Patti) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
  • 06/11/2019
  • Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 05/23/2019 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form 309A to: ABC Finance 3848 E 5th St Tucson, AZ 85716-5145. (ADIrm adi) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
  • 05/23/2019
  • (#6) Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#5) Notice Date 05/23/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#5) Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines. (ADI341AA) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM at Ohio Building, Toledo. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 09/16/2019. Financial Management Certificate for Debtor due by 09/16/2019. (admin, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#4) Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Erin M. Burke. (Zelvy, Robert aty) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Erin M. Burke. (Zelvy, Robert aty) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Erin M. Burke. (Zelvy, Robert aty) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(19-31587) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40158493. Fee amount 335.00. (re:Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Erin M. Burke (Zelvy, Robert aty) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.