This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 05:19:35

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Eric Lee Tavious Hill in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 6:19-BK-19036
  • Filing Date 10/15/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 7
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Scott C Clarkson
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • Trustee Robert Whitmore (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • US Trustee United States Trustee (RS)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Eric Lee Tavious Hill
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Eric L...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on ...

Fees Apply
1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

Fees Apply
1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

Fees Apply
#1

Main Document

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 13. Receipt Number 60147791. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Eric Lee Tavious Hill . (Zamora, Ed) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Eric Lee Tavious Hill . (Zamora, Ed) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Eric Lee Tavious Hill . (Zamora, Ed) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Zamora, Ed) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
  • 10/15/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Eric Lee Tavious Hill Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 11/14/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 10/29/2019. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 10/29/2019. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 10/29/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Zamora, Ed) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.