This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 12/11/2020 at 05:24:02 (UTC).

Elina Sargsyan

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Elina Sargsyan was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Barry Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-20867

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Debtor

Elina Sargsyan

Glendale, CA 91210

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Brad D Krasnoff (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

David A Tilem

Attorney at Law Offices of David A Tilem

206 N Jackson St Ste 201

Glendale, CA 91206

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Elina Sargsyan. (Tilem, David) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Elina Sargsyan Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 01/11/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 12/24/2020. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 12/24/2020. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 12/24/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 12/24/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 12/24/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 12/24/2020. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 12/24/2020. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 12/24/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 12/24/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 12/24/2020. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 12/24/2020. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 12/24/2020. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 12/24/2020. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 12/24/2020. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 12/24/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 12/24/2020. (Tilem, David) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:20-bk-20867) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 52167113. Fee amount 338.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/12/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 03/15/2021. Cert. of Financial Management due by 03/15/2021 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Tilem, David) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Elina Sargsyan. (Tilem, David) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Elina Sargsyan. (Tilem, David) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Elina Sargsyan Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 01/11/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 12/24/2020. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 12/24/2020. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 12/24/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 12/24/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 12/24/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 12/24/2020. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 12/24/2020. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 12/24/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 12/24/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 12/24/2020. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 12/24/2020. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 12/24/2020. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 12/24/2020. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 12/24/2020. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 12/24/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 12/24/2020. (Tilem, David) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Tilem Esquire