This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2021 at 07:00:56 (UTC).

Elaine M. Reed

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Elaine M Reed was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Randal S Mashburn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-BK-02725

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Randal S Mashburn

 

Party Details

Debtor

Elaine M. Reed

Franklin, TN 37069

Us Trustee

US TRUSTEE

701 Broadway Ste 318

Nashville, TN 37203-3966

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

JOSEPH P RUSNAK

Attorney at TUNE ENTREKIN & WHITE PC

Capitol View, Suite 600, 500 11Th Avenue North

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

5 #3

Mailing Matrix

5 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Briefing for Debtor Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Elaine M. Reed (RE: related document(s)#1). (RUSNAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount is $1738.00. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/5/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 01/5/2022. (RUSNAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Notice to Employ Tune, Entrekin & White, PC as Attorney. If timely response hearing will be held on 10/19/2021 at 09:30 AM, Courtroom 1, 2nd Floor Customs House, 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Mailing Matrix) Certificate of Service mailed on 9/07/2021. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Elaine M. Reed. (RUSNAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Credit Briefing for Debtor Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Elaine M. Reed (RE: related document(s)#1). (RUSNAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:21-bk-02725) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number 17188405. Fee amount $ 1738.00. (re:Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount is $1738.00. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/5/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 01/5/2022. (RUSNAK, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant