This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/15/2022 at 07:53:46 (UTC).

El Calamar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2022 El Calamar, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Theodor Albert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-BK-11188

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Theodor Albert

 

Party Details

Debtor

El Calamar, Inc.

315 W. 17Th Street

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Trustee

Arturo Cisneros (TR)

Irvine, CA 92612

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael Jay Berger

9454 Wilshire Blvd 6Th Fl

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2929

Trustee Attorney

Arturo Cisneros

2112 Business Center Dr 2Nd Fl

Irvine, CA 92612

Us Trustee Attorney

Michael J Hauser

411 W Fourth St Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#64 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#66

(#66) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#63 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#65

(#65) Declaration re: Peter Garza Regarding Service of the Scheduling Order After Initial Status Conference [Docket No. 64]. Filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#64 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#64

(#64) Scheduling Order After Initial Status Conference (BNC-PDF) - Confirmation Hearing For Subchapter V Plan is Schedule For December 14, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5B - Signed on 8/31/2022. (GD) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#63

(#63) Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral On A Final Basis (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #14 ) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Cash Collateral Motion is granted on a final basis. Signed on 8/31/2022 (GD) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#59

(#59) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#56 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/27/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/27/2022)

#58

(#58) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#53 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/26/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#57

No Description Available

#56

(#59) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#56 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/27/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/27/2022)

#55

No Description Available

#54

No Description Available

#53

(#58) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#53 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/26/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#52

No Description Available

#51

No Description Available

#50

No Description Available

#49

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#64 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#63 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Declaration re: Peter Garza Regarding Service of the Scheduling Order After Initial Status Conference [Docket No. 64]. Filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#64 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Scheduling Order After Initial Status Conference (BNC-PDF) - Confirmation Hearing For Subchapter V Plan is Schedule For December 14, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5B - Signed on 8/31/2022. (GD) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral On A Final Basis (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #14 ) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Cash Collateral Motion is granted on a final basis. Signed on 8/31/2022 (GD) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#14 Emergency motion filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc.) - Motion is granted. Movant to submit order. (GD) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docket(#61) Hearing Set Re: Plan Confirmation Hearing; Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/14/2022 at 1:30 PM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD) Modified on 9/2/2022 (GD). (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Hearing Held Re: Status Conference RE: Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc.) - Plan Confirmation hearing on December 14, 2022 at 10:00 a.m.; Ballot tally and confirmation brief due December 9, 2022; objections to confirmation due December 9, 2022; Debtor's counsel to submit scheduling order. (GD) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#56 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/27/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#53 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/26/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect/incomplete debtor(s) name entered. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. TAX ID Number was incorrectly entered in the Social Security Number field. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc.) (TS) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc.) (TS) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc.) (TS) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc.) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 8/1/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 8/1/2022. (TS) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc.) List of Equity Security Holders due 8/1/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 8/1/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 8/1/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 8/1/2022. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 8/1/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 8/1/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 8/1/2022. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 8/1/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 8/1/2022. (TS) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • Docket(#4) Tax Documents for the Year for 2020 Filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc El Calamar, Inc.. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement Filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc El Calamar, Inc.. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor El Calamar, Inc El Calamar, Inc.. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 8:22-bk-11188) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54454910. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by El Calamar, Inc El Calamar, Inc. Incomplete Filings due by 08/1/2022. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 10/17/2022. (Berger, Michael) WARNING: See docket entries #7,#8 for corrections. Case Also Deficient: List of Equity Security Holders due 8/1/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 8/1/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 8/1/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 8/1/2022. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 8/1/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 8/1/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 8/1/2022. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 8/1/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 8/1/2022. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 8/1/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 8/1/2022. Debtor's name and EIN Number updated to reflect pdf. Modified on 7/18/2022 (TS). (Entered: 07/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Hauser