This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/30/2021 at 06:32:59 (UTC).

Edward Garcia

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Edward Garcia was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-40288

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

Edward Garcia

Plano, TX 75025

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Eric A. Liepins

Attorney at Eric A. Liepins, P.C.

12770 Coit Road, Suite 850

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee Attorney

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#40 A telephonic final will be held on 5/25/2021 at 01:30 PM to consider and act upon the Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee filed as document number #38.). Notice Date 04/29/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#40

(#40) A telephonic final will be held on 5/25/2021 at 01:30 PM to consider and act upon the Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee filed as document number #38. (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#39

(#39) Objection Filed by Edward Garcia (RE: related document(s)#38 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List Matrix) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

38 #3

Service List Matrix

38 #2

Proposed Order

38 #1

Main Document

#37

(#37) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#34 Order on Application for Authority to Employ Counsel for Debtor (RE: related document(s)#3 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Edward Garcia). (lc)). Notice Date 04/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/04/2021)

#34

(#34) Order on Application for Authority to Employ Counsel for Debtor (RE: related document(s)#3 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Edward Garcia). (lc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

14 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Main Document

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONE INSTRUCTIONS for 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/26/2021 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (kms) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#6

(#6) Meeting Of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/26/2021 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 5/25/2021. Proofs of Claims due by 6/29/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/30/2021. (kms) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 03/15/2021. (kms) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#3

Service List

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Edward Garcia (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#1

Original Declaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#4 Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Edward Garcia (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Edward Garcia, Document Due 03/8/2021. filed by Debtor Edward Garcia). filed by Debtor Edward Garcia). (kms) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#40 A telephonic final will be held on 5/25/2021 at 01:30 PM to consider and act upon the Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee filed as document number #38.). Notice Date 04/29/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) A telephonic final will be held on 5/25/2021 at 01:30 PM to consider and act upon the Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee filed as document number #38. (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Objection Filed by Edward Garcia (RE: related document(s)#38 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List Matrix) filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List Matrix) (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#34 Order on Application for Authority to Employ Counsel for Debtor (RE: related document(s)#3 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Edward Garcia). (lc)). Notice Date 04/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#33 Order Granting Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Except as to Creditor U.S. Bank Trust National Association (RE: related document(s)#14 Motion for Continuation of Stay in Consecutive Case As To All Creditors Filed by Edward Garcia (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor Edward Garcia). (kms)). Notice Date 04/03/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#32 Notice of Missing Documents (Financial Management Certificate) to Individual Debtor (adi)). Notice Date 04/03/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Order on Application for Authority to Employ Counsel for Debtor (RE: related document(s)#3 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Edward Garcia). (lc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Order Granting Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Except as to Creditor U.S. Bank Trust National Association (RE: related document(s)#14 Motion for Continuation of Stay in Consecutive Case As To All Creditors Filed by Edward Garcia (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor Edward Garcia). (kms) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Notice of Missing Documents (Financial Management Certificate) to Individual Debtor (adi) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Declaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#4 Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Edward Garcia (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Edward Garcia, Document Due 03/8/2021. filed by Debtor Edward Garcia). filed by Debtor Edward Garcia). (kms) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Service Filed by Edward Garcia (RE: related document(s)#3 Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Edward Garcia (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Service List) filed by Debtor Edward Garcia). (Attachments: #1 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONE INSTRUCTIONS for 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/26/2021 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (kms) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Meeting Of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/26/2021 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 5/25/2021. Proofs of Claims due by 6/29/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/30/2021. (kms) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 03/15/2021. (kms) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Edward Garcia (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Edward Garcia, Document Due 03/8/2021. filed by Debtor Edward Garcia). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Edward Garcia (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-40288) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11962798, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Edward Garcia (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Edward Garcia, Document Due 03/8/2021.(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman