This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:08:27 (UTC).

Edmond Hartoonian and Melania Sahakian

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Edmond Hartoonian and Melania Sahakian in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-22109

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Debtors

Edmond Hartoonian

Melania Sahakian

Trustee

Wesley H Avery (TR)

US Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#13

(#13) Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#12

(#12) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#11

(#11) Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Official Form 108) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#10

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#9

(#9) Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

8 #2

Supplement paystubs

8 #1

Main Document

#7

(#7) Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Official Form 122A-1) (BNC Option) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Attorney's Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Addendum to voluntary petition Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Edmond Hartoonian, Melania Sahakian Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Judge Barry Russell added to case. Involvement of Judge Ernest M. Robles Terminated - due to reassignment of case - prior case is 2:09-bk-37567 BR (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 01/21/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/21/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Official Form 108) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Attachments: #1 Supplement paystubs) (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Official Form 122A-1) (BNC Option) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:19-bk-22109) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49917168. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Attorney's Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Addendum to voluntary petition Filed by Debtor Edmond Hartoonian, Joint Debtor Melania Sahakian. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Edmond Hartoonian, Melania Sahakian Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Issakhanian, Asbet) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.