This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/04/2022 at 03:47:30 (UTC).

Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel M Isicoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10882

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Laurel M Isicoff

 

Party Details

Debtor

Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC

14261 Commerce Way, Suite 205

Hialeah, FL 33016

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Trustee

Tarek Kirk Kiem

Greenacres, FL 33454

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Vivian Bauza

Attorney at Lydecker Diaz

1221 Brickell Ave. 19Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Carlos L De Zayas, Esq

1221 Brickell Ave, 19 Fl

Miami, FL 33131

Erin M Hoskins

1221 Brickell Ave., 19Th Fl

Miami, FL 33131

Us Trustee Attorney

Dan L Gold

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#83

(#83) Agreed Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay Re: #74 (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

82 #2

Mailing Matrix

82 #1

Main Document

#81

(#81) Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem (Re: #79 First and Final Application for Compensation for Tarek Kirk Kiem, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 2/3/2022 to 3/22/2022, Fee: $4425.00, Expenses: $42.38. filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem, #80 Notice of Hearing). (Kiem, Tarek) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#80

(#80) Notice of Hearing (Re: #79 First and Final Application for Compensation for Tarek Kirk Kiem, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 2/3/2022 to 3/22/2022, Fee: $4425.00, Expenses: $42.38) Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2022 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference. (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#79

(#79) Summary First and Final Application for Compensation for Tarek Kirk Kiem, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 2/3/2022 to 3/22/2022, Fee: $4425.00, Expenses: $42.38. Filed by Attorney Tarek Kirk Kiem (Kiem, Tarek) Modified on 3/23/2022**To edit text** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#78

(#78) Monthly Operating Report for the Period Beginning 2/2/2022 and Ending 2/28/2022 Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC. (Hoskins, Erin) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#74

(#83) Agreed Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay Re: #74 (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

30 #2

Matrix

30 #1

Main Document

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Robert F. Elgidely Esq. Filed by Creditor First Citizens Bank & Trust Co.. (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) Amended Document To Reflect Electronic Signature to Match Attorney Login Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC (Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC). (De Zayas, Carlos) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Deadline to Correct Filing Deficiencies. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 2/10/2022].Corporate Ownership Statement due 2/10/2022.Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 2/10/2022. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#5

(#5) List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#3

(#3) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#1

(#8) Amended Document To Reflect Electronic Signature to Match Attorney Login Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC (Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC). (De Zayas, Carlos) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Agreed Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay Re: #74 (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Notice Of Withdrawal Without Prejudice Of (#30 Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay). Filed by Creditor First Citizens Bank & Trust Co.. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Elgidely, Robert). **Modified on 3/28/2022 to Edit Text and Add Linkage** (Cohen, Diana). (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem (Re: #79 First and Final Application for Compensation for Tarek Kirk Kiem, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 2/3/2022 to 3/22/2022, Fee: $4425.00, Expenses: $42.38. filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem, #80 Notice of Hearing). (Kiem, Tarek) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Notice of Hearing (Re: #79 First and Final Application for Compensation for Tarek Kirk Kiem, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 2/3/2022 to 3/22/2022, Fee: $4425.00, Expenses: $42.38) Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2022 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference. (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Summary First and Final Application for Compensation for Tarek Kirk Kiem, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 2/3/2022 to 3/22/2022, Fee: $4425.00, Expenses: $42.38. Filed by Attorney Tarek Kirk Kiem (Kiem, Tarek) Modified on 3/23/2022**To edit text** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Monthly Operating Report for the Period Beginning 2/2/2022 and Ending 2/28/2022 Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC. (Hoskins, Erin) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert F. Elgidely Esq. (Re: #76 Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7, Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDeadline(s) Updated. Chapter 11 Plan Due and Disclosure Statement Due 6/2/2022 (120 days from petition date) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Order Granting Verified Motion to Designate Debtor as a Single Asset Real Estate Entity - Reclassified as a Regular Chapter 11 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date of February 2, 2022 Re: #30, Denying Without Prejudice Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 (Re: #30) , The Subchapter V Trustee is Discharged and Shall File a Fee Application Within Thirty (30) Days of the Date of Entry of this Order. (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Order Granting Expedited Amended Motion To Continue Evidentiary Hearing On: (#30 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $188] Filed by Creditor First Citizens Bank & Trust Co). Hearing scheduled for 04/07/2022 at 09:30 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Robert F. Elgidely Esq. Filed by Creditor First Citizens Bank & Trust Co.. (Elgidely, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Document To Reflect Electronic Signature to Match Attorney Login Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC (Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC). (De Zayas, Carlos) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Deadline to Correct Filing Deficiencies. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 2/10/2022].Corporate Ownership Statement due 2/10/2022.Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 2/10/2022. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Electronic Signature Does Not Correspond to Attorney Login. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE AN AMENDED **VOLUNTARY PETITION** WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. (Re: #1 Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 04/13/2022.) (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Edgewater Holdings Miami, LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(22-10882) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40420468. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 04/13/2022. (Hoskins, Erin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan L Gold