This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:10:45 (UTC).

Deronn Hasan

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Deronn Hasan was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott H. Yun. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-BK-10071

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Scott H. Yun

 

Party Details

Debtor

Deronn Hasan

Chino, CA 91708

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

 

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/05/2020 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/24/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 03/16/2020. (Davies-harris, Wanda) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Deronn Hasan . (Davies-harris, Wanda) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/05/2020 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/24/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 03/16/2020. (Davies-harris, Wanda) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Deronn Hasan Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/21/2020. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/21/2020. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 1/21/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/21/2020. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/21/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/21/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/21/2020. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 1/21/2020. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 1/21/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 1/21/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/21/2020. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 1/21/2020. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 1/21/2020. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 1/21/2020. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 1/21/2020. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 1/21/2020. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 1/21/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 1/21/2020. (Davies-harris, Wanda) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.