This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:12:35 (UTC).

Denise L Gatson

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Denise L Gatson was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark S Wallace. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-BK-13995

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Mark S Wallace

 

Party Details

Debtor

Denise L Gatson

Anaheim, CA 92804

Trustee

Jeffrey I Golden (TR)

Costa Mesa, CA 92628-2470

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Aaron Lloyd

Po Box 196

San Clemente, CA 92674

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#9 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 02/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Gomez, Andrea) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

7 #2

Supplement Form 423

7 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#5 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 10/17/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/27/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 3-110, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Objections for Discharge due by 01/27/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/27/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

4 #2

Supplement paystubs

4 #1

Main Document

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Denise L Gatson. (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Denise L Gatson (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#9 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 02/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#10) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISCHARGE. Order of Discharge in the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Auto Closed) (Alcala, Maria) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Gomez, Andrea) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docket(#8) Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Jeffrey I Golden (TR), having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 50266.08, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $ 100252.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 100252.00. Debtor appeared.. (Golden (TR), Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Denise L Gatson (RE: related document(s)#5 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)). (Attachments: #1 Supplement Form 423) (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#5 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 10/17/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Denise L Gatson Case Number #03-46731, Chapter 7 filed in Illinois Northern Bankruptcy on 11/17/2003 , Standard Discharge on 03/15/2004.(Admin) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/27/2019 at 08:00 AM at RM 3-110, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Objections for Discharge due by 01/27/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/27/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Denise L Gatson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement paystubs) (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Denise L Gatson. (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Denise L Gatson. (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8:19-bk-13995) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49916291. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Denise L Gatson (Lloyd, Aaron) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.