This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 05:11:48 (UTC).

Debra Willis

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Debra Willis was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-16297

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Debra Willis

Hemet, CA 92545

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Paul Y Lee

Attorney at Law Offices of Paul Y Lee

10580 Magnolia Ave. Suite A

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) WARNING: See docket entry number 7 for corrective action. Modified on 7/19/2019 (Jewell, Cynthia Renee). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#8

(#8) Order Dismissing Case. See order for details - Debtor Dismissed (BNC-PDF). Signed on 7/19/2019 (RE: related document(s) Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Property value is listed at an amount LESS THAN the Secured Amount Claimed: 5 included. Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Debra Willis (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of dismissal (BNC) (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of dismissal (BNC) (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Dismissing Case. See order for details - Debtor Dismissed (BNC-PDF). Signed on 7/19/2019 (RE: related document(s) Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. PDF reflects Declaration as to Whether Debtor Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition(LBR Form F1002-1). (RE: related document(s)#4 Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Debtor Debra Willis) (Jewell, Cynthia Renee) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Judge Wayne E. Johnson added to case due to prior related case 6:19-bk-15647 WJ. Involvement of Judge Mark D. Houle Terminated (Jewell, Cynthia Renee) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #2 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #2 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #2 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #2 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #2 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 09/27/2019. (Lee, Paul) WARNING: Notice not generated thru BNC due to Judge reassignment. Modified on 7/19/2019 (Jewell, Cynthia Renee). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:19-bk-16297) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49423858. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) WARNING: See docket entry number 7 for corrective action. Modified on 7/19/2019 (Jewell, Cynthia Renee). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Property value is listed at an amount LESS THAN the Secured Amount Claimed: 5 included. Filed by Debtor Debra Willis. (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Debra Willis (Lee, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.