This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/22/2022 at 06:31:50 (UTC).

David Michael Mobley

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 David Michael Mobley was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher M. Lopez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-BK-60004

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher M. Lopez

 

Party Details

Debtor

David Michael Mobley

Richmond, TX 77406

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Trustees

Melissa A Haselden

Houston, TX 77002

Janet Northrup, Chapter 7 Trustee

1201 Louisiana, 28Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Jerome A Brown

Attorney at The Brown Law Firm

13900 Sawyer Ranch Rd

Dripping Springs, TX 78620-4539

Us Trustee Attorneys

Alicia Lenae Barcomb

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

515 Rusk Street, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Jayson B. Ruff

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

515 Rusk St., Ste. 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Trustee Attorney

Heather Heath McIntyre

Attorney at HughesWattersAskanase

1201 Louisiana, 28Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) Amended Order Granting Debor-in-Possession's Application to Approve Employment of Bankruptcy Counsel, Jerome A. Brown of the Brown Law Firm. Signed on 3/21/2022 (Related document(s):#26 Application to Employ) (kpico) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#43

(#43) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Melissa E Valdez Filed by on behalf of MATAGORDA ISD (Valdez, Melissa) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

42 #5

Proposed Order

42 #4

Exhibit 3 - M/G Finance POC

42 #3

Exhibit 2 - Amd Sched E/F

42 #2

Exhibit 1 - Amd Sched D

42 #1

Main Document

41 #2

Proposed Order

41 #1

Main Document

26 #2

Proposed Order

26 #1

Main Document

#8

(#8) Amended Petition Official Form 101 (Filed By David Michael Mobley ). (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Melissa A Haselden added to case as trustee. (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/17/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 4/18/2022. Proofs of Claims due by 5/18/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/25/2022. (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Tara LeDay Filed by on behalf of Wharton County, Texas (LeDay, Tara) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#3

(#3) Statement Verified Statement of Debtor, David Michael Mobley, Regarding 11 U.S.C. 1116(1)(B) (Filed By David Michael Mobley ).(Related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Filed By David Michael Mobley ). (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#1

(#3) Statement Verified Statement of Debtor, David Michael Mobley, Regarding 11 U.S.C. 1116(1)(B) (Filed By David Michael Mobley ).(Related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Amended Order Granting Debor-in-Possession's Application to Approve Employment of Bankruptcy Counsel, Jerome A. Brown of the Brown Law Firm. Signed on 3/21/2022 (Related document(s):#26 Application to Employ) (kpico) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Melissa E Valdez Filed by on behalf of MATAGORDA ISD (Valdez, Melissa) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Objection to Debtor's Designation/Election as a Subchapter V Debtor. Filed by Quality Lease Rental Service, LLC, Quality Lease Service, LLC, Quality Lease and Rental Holdings, LLC, Rocaceia, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amd Sched D #2 Exhibit 2 - Amd Sched E/F #3 Exhibit 3 - M/G Finance POC #4 Proposed Order) (Cicack, Walter) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Motion Objecting to Subchapter V Designation Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Heather Heath McIntyre Filed by on behalf of Janet Northrup, Chapter 7 Trustee (McIntyre, Heather) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Amended Notice of 2004 Examination of Debtor, David Michael Mobley, with Document Subpoena. (Related document(s):#34 Notice) Filed by Quality Lease Rental Service, LLC, Quality Lease Service, LLC, Quality Lease and Rental Holdings, LLC, Rocaceia, LLC (Attachments: #1 Subpoena) (Cicack, Walter) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#37 Order on Emergency Motion) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 03/10/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Order Granting Unopposed Emergency Motion to Extend Deadlines to Object to Debtor's Exemptions and File Complaints (Related Doc #33). Signed on 3/8/2022. (rsal) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Status Report (Filed By David Michael Mobley ).(Related document(s):#23 Order Setting Hearing) (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 1/31/2022, $0 disbursed (Filed By David Michael Mobley ). (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Petition Official Form 101 (Filed By David Michael Mobley ). (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Melissa A Haselden added to case as trustee. (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/17/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 4/18/2022. Proofs of Claims due by 5/18/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/25/2022. (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Tara LeDay Filed by on behalf of Wharton County, Texas (LeDay, Tara) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-60004) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23505095. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jayson B. Ruff (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#4) Tax Documents for the Year 2020. Tax documents are available for reviewing in the office of the clerk (Filed By David Michael Mobley ). (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement Verified Statement of Debtor, David Michael Mobley, Regarding 11 U.S.C. 1116(1)(B) (Filed By David Michael Mobley ).(Related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Filed By David Michael Mobley ). (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by David Michael Mobley. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 04/21/2022. (Brown, Jerome) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather Heath McIntyre