This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/03/2022 at 22:24:33 (UTC).

David Michael D'Amico

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 David Michael D'Amico was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-15201

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtor

David Michael D'Amico

San Monica, CA 90406

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Vahe Khojayan

Attorney at YK Law, LLP

445 S. Figueroa Street, Ste 2280

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Us Trustee Attorney

Kelly L Morrison

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

915 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#105

(#105) Notice of Hearing on Motion for Approval of Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

104 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

104 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

104 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

104 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

104 #1

Main Document

#103

(#103) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#102

(#102) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#101

(#101) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 05/31/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#100

(#100) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#8

(#8) Motion for Setting Property Value re: 1216 N. Mariposa Ave, Los Angeles, CA 90029 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#7

6 #2

Ch 13 First Mtg

6 #1

Ch 13 First Mtg

#5

#3

#2

#1

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) Notice of Hearing on Motion for Approval of Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Disclosure Statement , Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A #2 Exhibit Exhibit B #3 Exhibit Exhibit C #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 05/31/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2022 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#97 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) Order After Initial Status Conference in Chapter 11 Case: (1) Setting Deadline For Filing Proofs of Claim And Requiring Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 3003-1; (2) Setting Deadline to Hold a Hearing on Objection to Claims; and (3) Setting Hearing on Motion For Order Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #67 ) Signed on 4/12/2022 (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other: CORRECTION: Incorrect hearing information on PDF - THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#95 Notice of Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim (Ch 11) filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico) (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for Setting Property Value re: 1216 N. Mariposa Ave, Los Angeles, CA 90029 Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 7/9/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 7/9/2021. (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 7/9/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 7/9/2021. (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/5/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proofs of Claims due by 9/3/2021. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(# 2:21-bk-15201) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53096637. Fee amount 313.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor David Michael D'Amico. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by David Michael D'Amico (Khojayan, Vahe)NOTE: The docket has been Modified on 6/25/2021 to reflect the debtor's mailing address and not the physical address; Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 7/9/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 7/9/2021. (Garcia, Elaine L.). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly L Morrison