This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 05:08:20 (UTC).

Daniel Jerry Fosados

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Daniel Jerry Fosados was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Barry Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-18435

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Debtor

Daniel Jerry Fosados

Long Beach, CA 90805

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

John J Menchaca (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Main Document

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Daniel Jerry Fosados . (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

7 #2

Ntc Pymnt Fees Instlmnt

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Daniel Jerry Fosados (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Daniel Jerry Fosados . (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/22/2019 at 11:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 10/21/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 10/21/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#6

(#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Daniel Jerry Fosados (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Installment Filing Fee - $100.00 by 20. Receipt Number 20236029. (admin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Installment Filing Fee - $40.00 by 20. Receipt Number 20236028. (admin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Denying Application To Proceed in forma pauperis and Notice for payment of filing fees in installments. First Installment Amount: $40.00, Second Installment Amount: $99.00, Third Installment Amount: $98.00, Final Installment Amount: $98.00. (Related Doc #6). Signed on 7/19/2019. First Installment Payment due by 7/19/2019. Second Installment Payment due by 7/31/2019. Third Installment Payment due by 8/12/2019. Final Installment Payment due by 8/19/2019. (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Daniel Jerry Fosados (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Daniel Jerry Fosados . (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Daniel Jerry Fosados . (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Daniel Jerry Fosados . (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/22/2019 at 11:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 10/21/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 10/21/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Daniel Jerry Fosados (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.