This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2021 at 06:31:58 (UTC).

Dalton Crane, L.C.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Dalton Crane, L C was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Eduardo V Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-33218

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Eduardo V Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Debtor

Dalton Crane, L.C.

Edna, TX 77957

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael G Colvard

Attorney at Martin & Drought, P.C.

112 East Pecan Street, Suite 1616

San Antonio, TX 78205

Us Trustee Attorney

Stephen Douglas Statham

Attorney at Office of US Trustee

515 Rusk, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

95 #6

Exhibit 5

95 #5

Exhibit 4

95 #4

Exhibit 3

95 #3

Exhibit 2

95 #2

Exhibit 1

95 #1

Main Document

87 #2

Service List

55 #2

Proposed Order

55 #1

Main Document

6 #3

Service List

6 #1

Main Document

5 #3

Service List

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Main Document

#4

#3

#2

#1

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Dalton Crane, L.C. ).(Related document(s):#55 Motion for Relief From Stay) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5) (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Declaration re: of Joshua Dalton in Support of Response/Opposition to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay of People's Capital and Leasing Corp and Motion for Automatic Stay of Simmons Bank (Filed By Dalton Crane, L.C. ).(Related document(s):#85 Response, #87 Response) (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Declaration re: of Robert Van Tine in Support of People's Capital and Leasing Corp.'s Motion for Relief from Stay (Filed By People's Capital and Leasing Corp ).(Related document(s):#55 Motion for Relief From Stay) (Goldstein, Evan) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#89 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay) No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 11/25/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Operating Report for Filing Period October 31, 2021, $431,670.00 disbursed (Filed By Dalton Crane, L.C. ). (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christopher V Arisco Filed by on behalf of Midland States Bank d/b/a Midland Equipment Finance (Arisco, Christopher) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Relief From the Automatic Stay to Permit State Court Case to Proceed. (Related Doc #52) Signed on 11/23/2021. (jchavez) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#86 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice) No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 11/19/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Response (related document(s):#76 Motion for Relief From Stay). Filed by Dalton Crane, L.C. (Attachments: #1 Service List) (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc #84) Signed on 11/17/2021. (jchavez) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Dalton Crane, L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Service List) (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for Entry of Order (I) Determining that Utility Providers have been provided with Adequate Assurance Payment, (II) Approving Proposed Adequate Assurance Procedures, (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Services, (IV) Determining that Debtor is not Required to Provide any Additional Assurance;(V) Schedule a Hearing to Consider Entry of Order, and (VI) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Dalton Crane, L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Service List) (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and 1107(a) to Establish Critical Vendor Payment Procedures Filed by Debtor Dalton Crane, L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Service List) (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing Debtor to (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages and other Compensation, and Employee Benefits, and (B) Continue Existing Employee Benefit Plans and Programs; (II) Authorizing Banks and Financial Institutions to Pay all Checks and Electronic Requests; and, (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Dalton Crane, L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Service List) (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing Debtor to, in the ordinary course, (A) Use Cash Management System, Bank Accounts, and Business Forms; (II) Authorizing Banks and Financial Institutions to Honor and Process all Related Check and Electronic Payment Requests; and, (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Dalton Crane, L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Service List) (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration re: Declaration in Support of Chapter 11 Petition and First Day Motions (Filed By Dalton Crane, L.C. ). (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration re: Resolution of Dalton Crane, L.C. Authorizing Filing of a Chapter 11 Petition (Filed By Dalton Crane, L.C. ). (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) for Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders , Schedule D for Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims for Non-Individual , Schedule G for Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H for Non-Individual- Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for for Non-Individual , Schedule A/B: Property for Non-Individual (Filed By Dalton Crane, L.C. ). (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-33218) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23292235. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Dalton Crane, L.C.. (Colvard, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant