This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/15/2022 at 06:33:55 (UTC).

Curtiss Courtyard, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Curtiss Courtyard, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-11154

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A Mark

 

Party Details

Debtor

Curtiss Courtyard, LLC

260 Morningside Drive

Miami Springs, FL 33166

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Trustee

Aleida Martinez-Molina

Miami, FL 33127

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Richard R Robles, Esq

905 Brickell Bay Dr #228

Miami, FL 33131

Us Trustee Attorney

Steven D Schneiderman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

Trustee Attorney

Aleida Martinez-Molina

2121 Nw 2Nd Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33127

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC (Re: #45 Response filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC, #46 Order Continuing Hearing, #47 Order Continuing Hearing). (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#47

(#47) Order Resetting Hearings and Compelling Appearance by Debtor's Representative On (Re: SubChapter V Status Conference, #29 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens (11450 SW 40 Street, Miami, FL 33165) pursuant to 11 USC 363 f. Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC., #31 Application to Employ First Home Realty, Inc. and Victor Tarin as Real Estate Broker [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC, #34 Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Money on Demand, Inc. and #40 Expedited Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for the Debtor (Richard R. Robles, P.A.) Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC.). Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

45 #6

Exhibit E

45 #5

Exhibit D

45 #4

Exhibit C

45 #3

Exhibit B

45 #2

Exhibit A

45 #1

Main Document

29 #3

Exhibit B

#8

(#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/16/2022 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/16/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 4/25/2022. (Barr, Ida) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by John P Arcia Filed by Creditor Money on Demand, Inc. (Arcia, John) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

6 #2

Exhibit Verified Statement

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Barr, Ida) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 2/22/2022]. Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 2/22/2022. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/28/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/28/2022. Schedule A/B due 2/28/2022. Schedule C due 2/28/2022. Schedule D due 2/28/2022. Schedule E/F due 2/28/2022. Schedule G due 2/28/2022. Schedule H due 2/28/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/28/2022. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/28/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/28/2022]. (Barr, Ida) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#3

(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #3 Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. 1111(b). Status hearing to be held on 04/07/2022 at 11:30 AM by TELEPHONE through CourtSolutions LLC.Pre-Status Report Due: 3/24/2022.) Notice Date 02/17/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC. (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 04/25/2022. (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC (Re: #45 Response filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC, #46 Order Continuing Hearing, #47 Order Continuing Hearing). (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Notice of Corrective Entry - (Re: #46 *INCOMPLETE ENTRY, IMAGE RESTRICTED. REFER TO ECF # 47 FOR CORRECT ENTRY** Order Resetting Hearings and Compelling Appearance by Debtor's Representative On (Re: #29 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens (11450 SW 40 Street, Miami, FL 33165) pursuant to 11 USC 363 f. Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC.). Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline) Modified on 4/8/2022 .) (Antillon, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Order Resetting Hearings and Compelling Appearance by Debtor's Representative On (Re: SubChapter V Status Conference, #29 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens (11450 SW 40 Street, Miami, FL 33165) pursuant to 11 USC 363 f. Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC., #31 Application to Employ First Home Realty, Inc. and Victor Tarin as Real Estate Broker [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC, #34 Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Money on Demand, Inc. and #40 Expedited Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for the Debtor (Richard R. Robles, P.A.) Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC.). Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) *INCOMPLETE ENTRY, IMAGE RESTRICTED. REFER TO ECF # 47 FOR CORRECT ENTRY** Order Resetting Hearings and Compelling Appearance by Debtor's Representative On (Re: #29 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens (11450 SW 40 Street, Miami, FL 33165) pursuant to 11 USC 363 f. Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC.). Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline) Modified on 4/8/2022 (Antillon, Jacqueline). (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Amended Response to (#34 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $188] filed by Creditor Money on Demand, Inc, #38 Response filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC) Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E) (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Certificate of Service by Attorney John P Arcia (Re: #34 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $188] filed by Creditor Money on Demand, Inc, #39 Notice of Hearing, #43 Objection filed by Creditor Money on Demand, Inc). (Arcia, John) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Objection to (#29 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens (11450 SW 40 Street, Miami, FL 33165) pursuant to 11 USC 363 f. [$188 Fee Amount] filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC) Filed by Creditor Money on Demand, Inc (Arcia, John) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC (Re: #40 Expedited Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for the Debtor (Richard R. Robles, P.A.) filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC, #41 Notice of Hearing). (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Notice of Hearing (Re: #40 Expedited Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for the Debtor (Richard R. Robles, P.A.) Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC.) Hearing scheduled for 04/07/2022 at 11:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Expedited Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for the Debtor (Richard R. Robles, P.A.) Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #3 Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. 1111(b). Status hearing to be held on 04/07/2022 at 11:30 AM by TELEPHONE through CourtSolutions LLC.Pre-Status Report Due: 3/24/2022.) Notice Date 02/17/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/16/2022 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/16/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 4/25/2022. (Barr, Ida) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by John P Arcia Filed by Creditor Money on Demand, Inc. (Arcia, John) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice Appointing Aleida Martinez-Molina as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Statement)(Schneiderman, Steven) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Barr, Ida) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 2/22/2022]. Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 2/22/2022. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/28/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/28/2022. Schedule A/B due 2/28/2022. Schedule C due 2/28/2022. Schedule D due 2/28/2022. Schedule E/F due 2/28/2022. Schedule G due 2/28/2022. Schedule H due 2/28/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/28/2022. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/28/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/28/2022]. (Barr, Ida) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. 1111(b). Status hearing to be held on 04/07/2022 at 11:30 AM by TELEPHONE through CourtSolutions LLC.Pre-Status Report Due: 3/24/2022. (Antillon, Jacqueline) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(22-11154) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40470889. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Curtiss Courtyard, LLC. (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 04/25/2022. (Robles, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aleida Martinez-Molina