This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:30:38 (UTC).

Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Erik P. Kimball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-BK-13552

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Erik P. Kimball

 

Party Details

Debtor

Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC

8895 North Military Trail, Suite 201E

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Robert C Furr, Esq

2255 Glades Rd #419A

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Alvin S. Goldstein, Esq

2255 Glades Rd #401A

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Us Trustee Attorney

Heidi A Feinman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2022 for Member Case Number 22-13552-EPK Filed by Debtor Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#39

(#39) Order Confirming that the Automatic Stay is Not in Effec as to Non-Debtor Impro Synergies, LLC Re: #17 (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

17 #9

Exhibit H - Impro Response

17 #8

Exhibit G - 5.10.22 Endorsed Order

17 #7

Exhibit F - Enforcement Motion

17 #6

Exhibit E - Final Judgment

17 #5

Exhibit D - Closing Statement of the Limited Partners

17 #2

Exhibit A - LPA CCH XXXI

17 #1

Main Document

#9

(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #3 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/18/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/18/2022. Schedule A/B due 5/18/2022. Schedule D due 5/18/2022. Schedule E/F due 5/18/2022. Schedule G due 5/18/2022. Schedule H due 5/18/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 5/18/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 5/18/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 5/18/2022].) Notice Date 05/07/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #4 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts .) Notice Date 05/07/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #6 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/7/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 8/8/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 7/13/2022.) Notice Date 05/07/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

#6

(#37) Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled/Continued Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee (Re: #6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/21/2022 at 01:30 PM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-915-4419 passcode 6071331. (Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Zachary J Bancroft Filed by Creditors MG GTC FUND I, LLC, MG GTC MIDDLE TIER I, LLC, MG AFFORDABLE MASTER, LLC. (Bancroft, Zachary) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#4

(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #4 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts .) Notice Date 05/07/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

#3

(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #3 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/18/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/18/2022. Schedule A/B due 5/18/2022. Schedule D due 5/18/2022. Schedule E/F due 5/18/2022. Schedule G due 5/18/2022. Schedule H due 5/18/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 5/18/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 5/18/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 5/18/2022].) Notice Date 05/07/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 07/13/2022. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 5/31/2022 for Member Case Number 22-13552-EPK Filed by Debtor Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Order Confirming that the Automatic Stay is Not in Effec as to Non-Debtor Impro Synergies, LLC Re: #17 (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Debtor Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC (Re: #23 Motion to Assume/Reject). (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled/Continued Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee (Re: #6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/21/2022 at 01:30 PM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-915-4419 passcode 6071331. (Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert C Furr Esq (Re: #34 Order on Application to Employ, #35 Order on Motion For Joint Administration). (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 9:22-bk-13550 with Member Case 9:22-bk-13552-EPK (Re: #12) (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Final Order Approving Employment of Robert C Furr Esq and the Law Firm of Furr and Cohen PA as Counsel for the Debtor in Possession Effective as of the Petition Date (Re: #15) (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Certificate of Service Filed by Creditors MG Affordable Master, LLC, MG GTC Middle Tier I, LLC (Re: #32 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice). (Bancroft, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Order Admitting Attorney pro hac vice (Re: #30) (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Clerk's Notice of Continued Hearing. **This continuance was announced on the record in open court on 5/25/22 @ 1:30 pm. This docket entry contains no underlying PDF image.** (Re: #17 Emergency Motion for Order Confirming the Automatic Stay is Not in Effect as to Non-Debtor Impro Synergies, LLC or, in the Alternative, for Order Terminating the Automatic Stay [Fee Amount $188] Filed by Creditors MG Affordable Master, LLC, MG GTC Middle Tier I, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - LPA CCH XXXI # 2 Exhibit B - Impro Prop Mgmt Agreement # 3 Exhibit C - District Court's Findings # 4 Exhibit D - Closing Statement of the Limited Partners # 5 Exhibit E - Final Judgment # 6 Exhibit F - Enforcement Motion # 7 Exhibit G - 5.10.22 Endorsed Order # 8 Exhibit H - Impro Response # 9 Exhibit I - 5.12.22 Endorsed Order) (Bancroft, Zachary) Modified on 5/18/2022-to edit text .) Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2022 at 01:30 PM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. Although the Court will conduct the hearing in person, any interested party may choose to attend the hearing remotely via Zoom. #To register, click on the link on the Court's webpage. (Leonard, Dawn) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #3 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/18/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/18/2022. Schedule A/B due 5/18/2022. Schedule D due 5/18/2022. Schedule E/F due 5/18/2022. Schedule G due 5/18/2022. Schedule H due 5/18/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 5/18/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 5/18/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 5/18/2022].) Notice Date 05/07/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #4 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts .) Notice Date 05/07/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #6 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/7/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 8/8/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 7/13/2022.) Notice Date 05/07/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/7/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 8/8/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 7/13/2022. (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Zachary J Bancroft Filed by Creditors MG GTC FUND I, LLC, MG GTC MIDDLE TIER I, LLC, MG AFFORDABLE MASTER, LLC. (Bancroft, Zachary) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/18/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/18/2022. Schedule A/B due 5/18/2022. Schedule D due 5/18/2022. Schedule E/F due 5/18/2022. Schedule G due 5/18/2022. Schedule H due 5/18/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 5/18/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 5/18/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 5/18/2022]. (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-13552) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A40844644. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Creative Choice Homes XXXI, LLC. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 07/13/2022. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heidi Ann Feinman(Designation Retained)