This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2021 at 06:33:52 (UTC).

Country Fresh Midco Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 Country Fresh Midco Corp was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judges overseeing this case are David R Jones and Marvin Isgur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-30576

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judges

David R Jones

Marvin Isgur

 

Party Details

Debtor

Country Fresh Midco Corp.

3200 Research Forest Drive, Suite A5

Woodlands, TX 77381

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

John P Melko

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

1000 Louisiana, Ste 2000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/18/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket(#4) No Creditor Mailing List (JacquelineMataadi) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketJudge Marvin Isgur is added to the case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones is terminated. (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 21-30574 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for Joint Administration under 21-30574. Signed on 2/16/2021 (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-30576) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22822165. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Country Fresh Midco Corp.. (Melko, John) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P Melko