This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/31/2021 at 06:32:28 (UTC).

Corry Davis Marketing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Corry Davis Marketing, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Joshua P. Searcy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-60280

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Joshua P. Searcy

 

Party Details

Debtors

Corry Davis Marketing, Inc.

Corry Davis Marketing, Inc., Debtor

542 East Highway 64

Canton, TX 75103

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave.Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Trustee

H. Thomas Moran (SBRA V), III

Gilchrist, TX 77616

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael E. Gazette

100 East Ferguson Streetste. 1000

Tyler, TX 75702

Us Trustee Attorney

Marcus Salitore

Attorney at US Trustee Office

110 N. College Ave., Room 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#44

#43

#42

41 #3

Exhibit 1

41 #1

Main Document

18 #3

Exhibit

18 #2

Service List

18 #1

Main Document

#13

6 #2

Affidavit

6 #1

Main Document

5 #4

Proposed Order

5 #3

Service List

5 #2

Rule 2014 declaration

5 #1

Main Document

#4

#2

#1

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 8/18/2021 Filed by US Trustee (Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Hearing Held. (RE: related document(s)#13 Notice of Status Conference by Virtual Hearing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188. Hearing scheduled for 8/24/2021 at 09:30 AM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYR Aug. 24). Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 8/10/2021. (at)). (at) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#42 Final Order Authorizing Debtor to Continue Insurance Premium Finance Agreement with Associated Risk Managers Finance Company (RE: related document(s)#18 Motion for Authority to Continue Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with Associated Risk Managers Finance Company Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List # 2 Exhibit) filed by Debtor Corry Davis Marketing, Inc.). (vh)). Notice Date 08/21/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2021 Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (Gazette, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Final Order Authorizing Debtor to Continue Insurance Premium Finance Agreement with Associated Risk Managers Finance Company (RE: related document(s)#18 Motion for Authority to Continue Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with Associated Risk Managers Finance Company Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Service List # 2 Exhibit) filed by Debtor Corry Davis Marketing, Inc.). (vh) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order or Judgment Submitted At Court's Direction RE: #18 Motion (Generic ) UPLOADED 2021-08-19 12:31 (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Held: Motion is Granted on a Final Basis. Debtor to Upload Proposed Order. (RE: related document(s)#18 Motion for Authority to Continue Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with Associated Risk Managers Finance Company filed by Debtor Corry Davis Marketing, Inc.). (at) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Motion to Obtain Credit to Enter into Insurance Premium Financing Agreement Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Service List #2 Exhibit 1 #3 Proposed Order) (Gazette, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Debtor's Subchapter V Consensual Reorganization Report Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Service List) (Gazette, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#38 Order Approving Application to Employ Allie Beth Allman & Associates as Real Estate Broker for Debtor-in-Possession (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Allie Beth Allman & Associates as Real Estate Broker Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Service List # 3 Exhibit # 4 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Corry Davis Marketing, Inc.). (bd)). Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Laurie A. Spindler) Filed by Van Zandt CAD (Spindler, Laurie) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Meeting of Creditors - 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (dd) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 9/10/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/29/2021. (dd) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice To Trustee H. Thomas Moran Of Selection And Appointment With Trustee's Acceptance. Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application to Employ Michael E. Gazette As Attorney for Debtor Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Rule 2014 declaration #2 Service List #3 Proposed Order) (Gazette, Michael) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (Gazette, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: H. Clinton Milner) Filed by LBC1 Trust (Milner, H.) (Entered: 07/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Matrix Filed Electronically by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc. (dd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-60280) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A12102714, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Corry Davis Marketing, Inc., Document Due 07/9/2021.(Gazette, Michael) Modified on 7/7/2021 (dd). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant