This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:14:07 (UTC).

Connie M Mallo

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Connie M Mallo in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-22163

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

Connie M Mallo

US Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

#3

(#3) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017.Objection 523 Complaint Due: 1/21/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 12/24/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/13/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Arias, Jose) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 19. Receipt Number 20237746. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017.Objection 523 Complaint Due: 1/21/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 12/24/2019. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/13/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Arias, Jose) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Connie M Mallo . (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Connie M Mallo Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 10/29/2019. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 10/29/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.