This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:09:10 (UTC).

Christopher Douglas Egge

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Christopher Douglas Egge was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheri Bluebond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-10097

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Sheri Bluebond

 

Party Details

Debtor

Christopher Douglas Egge

La Verne, CA 91750

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Jason M Rund (TR)

El Segundo, CA 90245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Charles Shamash

Attorney at Caceres & Shamash LLP

9701 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1000

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Christopher Douglas Egge. (Shamash, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Christopher Douglas Egge Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 02/5/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/21/2020. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/21/2020. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/21/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/21/2020. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/21/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/21/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/21/2020. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/21/2020. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/21/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/21/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/21/2020. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 01/21/2020. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) due 01/21/2020. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/21/2020. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/21/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 01/21/2020. (Shamash, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:20-bk-10097) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 50393574. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/12/2020 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 04/13/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 04/13/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Shamash, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Christopher Douglas Egge. (Shamash, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Christopher Douglas Egge. (Shamash, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Christopher Douglas Egge Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 02/5/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/21/2020. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/21/2020. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/21/2020. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/21/2020. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/21/2020. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/21/2020. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/21/2020. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/21/2020. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/21/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/21/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/21/2020. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 01/21/2020. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) due 01/21/2020. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/21/2020. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/21/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 01/21/2020. (Shamash, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.